Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND, . Nelson County, ND Superior Courts with Hager, Donald Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Leif Pedersen (ActiveEntered: 11/15/2021Docketed: 11/15/2021, 9:50 AMDamages: $16,171.03Current Costs Due: 03/22/2022, Execution, $10.0006/03/2022, Execution, $10.0012/20/2021, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 25 Satisfaction of Judgment - Leif Pedersen Satisfaction of Judgment - Leif Pedersen |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 26 Garnishment Execution - Leif Pedersen Garnishment Execution - Leif Pedersen |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ Index # 23 Returned Garnishment Execution Returned Garnishment Execution |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 24 Garnishment Execution Garnishment Execution |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ Index # 21 Returned Garnishment Execution Returned Garnishment Execution |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 22 Garnishment Execution Garnishment Execution |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 20 Notice of Entry of Judgment - Leif Pedersen Notice of Entry of Judgment - Leif Pedersen |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Entry of Judgment - Leif Pedersen Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Entry of Judgment - Leif Pedersen |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 18 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 17 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.