Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nathan James Bergh vs. Daryl Robert Bergh
A Restraining Order case was filed in the jurisdiction of Sargent County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 16, 2022
Filing Location
Sargent County, ND
Category
Restraining Order
Case Outcome Type
Judgment / Order Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 6 of Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order of Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 4 | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (10:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Cruff, Bradley A) - 41clk391180918 Result: Hearing Ended - 41clk391180918 |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 of Mailing of Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order to Nathan James Bergh of Mailing of Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order to Nathan James Bergh |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Sheriff's Return from Dickey County, delivered to Daryl Bergh 9/6/18 Sheriff's Return from Dickey County, delivered to Daryl Bergh 9/6/18 |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 1 for Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order for Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 2 |