Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Office of State Tax Commissioner vs. Craig Anderson
A Contract / Collection case was filed in the jurisdiction of Steele County, ND. Judge Marquart, Steven L. Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Office of State Tax CommissionerDebtor: Craig Anderson (ActiveEntered: 01/13/2014Docketed: 01/13/2014, 1:27 PMDamages: $5,628.09Interest Rate: 1.00% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2014
Last Refreshed
September 15, 2022
Filing Location
Steele County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Money Judgment Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 20 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Afffidavit of Service by Mail - Craig Anderson Afffidavit of Service by Mail - Craig Anderson |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 16 Order for Judgment Order for Judgment |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 17 | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 7 Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 13 Order for Judgment Order for Judgment |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 10 Affidavit for Default Judgment Affidavit for Default Judgment |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 Affidavit Identifying Judgment Debtor Affidavit Identifying Judgment Debtor |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 5 Notice of Motion for Default Judgment Notice of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 15 | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 12 Statement of Costs and Disbursements Statement of Costs and Disbursements |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 4 Sheriff's Return - Torina Messner for Craig Anderson Sheriff's Return - Torina Messner for Craig Anderson |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 9 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Craig Anderson Affidavit of Service by Mail - Craig Anderson |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 6 Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 14 Judgment Judgment |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate Index # 3 Certificate of Tax Commissioner Certificate of Tax Commissioner |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 8 Exhibit to the Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Exhibit to the Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |