Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Steele County, ND, . Steele County, ND Superior Courts with Marquart, Steven L. Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: AR Audit Services IncDebtor: Adrianne M Risser (ActiveEntered: 10/17/2016Damages: $1,903.09Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteele County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 19 Satisfaction Satisfaction |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 17 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 18 Adrianne Risser Adrianne Risser |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 14 | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 15 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 8 Brief In Support Of Motion For Default Judgment Brief In Support Of Motion For Default Judgment |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 13 Judgment - Laura Ringsak Judgment - Laura Ringsak |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Adrianne M Risser Service Adrianne M Risser Service |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Of Proof Assignment Merits And Verification Of Proof Assignment Merits And Verification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.