Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ProCollect Services LLC vs. Rachel Hanson
A Contract / Collection case was filed in the jurisdiction of Steele County, ND. Judge Marquart, Steven L. Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $608.81Creditor: ProCollect Services LLCDebtor: Rachel Hanson (ActiveEntered: 06/14/2017Docketed: 06/14/2017, 11:43 AMDamages: $598.81Current Costs Due: 08/16/2018, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 09, 2017
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2022
Filing Location
Steele County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Money Judgment Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 10 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 11 Affdavit of Mailing on Rachel Hanson Affdavit of Mailing on Rachel Hanson |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 1 Summons Summons |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 9 Proposed Judgment by Default by ProCollect Services LLC on Rachel Hanson Proposed Judgment by Default by ProCollect Services LLC on Rachel Hanson |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Service Document on Rachel Hanson Service Document on Rachel Hanson |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 7 Affidavit of No Answer, Identification, Non-Military Status, Amount Due and Costs and Disbursement Affidavit of No Answer, Identification, Non-Military Status, Amount Due and Costs and Disbursement |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Assignment Index # 6 Assignment Assignment |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 8 Proposed Order for Judgment by ProCollect Services LLC on Rachel Hanson Proposed Order for Judgment by ProCollect Services LLC on Rachel Hanson |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Affidavit of Default Affidavit of Default |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit of Proof Affidavit of Proof |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 2 Complaint Complaint |