Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Dennis H Amundson vs. Andrew Thomas
A Restraining Order case was filed in the jurisdiction of Steele County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 15, 2017
Last Refreshed
September 10, 2022
Filing Location
Steele County, ND
Category
Restraining Order
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Sheriff's Return Served Index # 8 | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 7 Permanent RO Permanent RO |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 6 Permanent RO Permanent RO |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Sheriff's Return Served Index # 5 | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquart, Steven L.) Judge Will Appear by ITV From Fargo (Steele County IP Address: 165.234.227.106) Result: Hearing Ended Judge Will Appear by ITV From Fargo (Steele County IP Address: 165.234.227.106) |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 4 | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 2 Temporary RO Temporary RO |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 3 | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 1 for Restraining Order for Restraining Order |