Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Restraining Order case in the jurisdiction of Steele County, ND, . Steele County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryRestraining Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSteele County, ND |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquart, Steven L.) Via Zoom: www.zoom.us Meeting ID: 830 3832 6789 Passcode: 630325 telephonic on zoom: 1(669)900-9128 using the same meeting ID and password (Respondent in the Stutsman Cty Jail - Per Steele Cty Clerk); CourtSmart - vjm; Via Zoom: www.zoom.us Meeting ID: 830 3832 6789 Passcode: 630325 telephonic on zoom: 1(669)900-9128 using the same meeting ID and password (Respondent in the Stutsman Cty Jail - Per Steele Cty Clerk); CourtSmart - vjm; |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 7 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Protection/Restraining Order Hearing Per Judge CANCELED Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquart, Steven L.) Per Judge Via Zoom: www.zoom.us Meeting ID: 830 3832 6789 Passcode: 630325 telephonic on zoom: 1(669)900-9128 using the same meeting ID and password |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 6 Rescheduled Zoom Restraining Order Hearing Rescheduled Zoom Restraining Order Hearing |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 5 Respondent-See Documents- Stutsman County Email Respondent-See Documents- Stutsman County Email |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 4 Served with Sheriff Served with Sheriff |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 3 | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 1 for Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order for Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form Index # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.