Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Tina Stewart
A Foreign Judgment case was filed in the jurisdiction of Steele County, ND. Judge Irby, John C Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $2,577.24Creditor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLCDebtor: Tina Stewart (ActiveEntered: 10/18/2017Docketed: 09/07/2023, 9:58 AMDamages: $2,577.24Interest Rate: 10.00% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 06, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Steele County, ND
Category
Foreign Judgment
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Judgment Enforcement
Case Outcome Type
Service Document Index # 6
Status
Foreign,Sister-State Judgment
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 6 Certificate of Service (Tina Stewart) Certificate of Service (Tina Stewart) |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 5 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 4 Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 3 Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Foreign Judgment Index # 1 Exhibit 1 (authenticated copy of judgment) Exhibit 1 (authenticated copy of judgment) |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 2 Petition for Registration of Foreign Judgment Petition for Registration of Foreign Judgment |