Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
filed a(n) Professional Torts (Malpractic case in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, OH, . Clinton County, OH Superior Courts with JOHN W. RUDDUCK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryProfessional Torts (Malpractic |
Last RefreshedMay 29, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationClinton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT APPLIED TO PRE-PAID $ -131.00 | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COSTS ASSIGNED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 230.52 TO ASCHI, D.O., PHILIP | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT APPLIED $ 99.52 | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT APPLIED TO PRE-PAID $ 131.00 | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT REFUND IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 250.00 | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT - RECEIPT NO. 2106868 IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 230.52 | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CANCELLED- 06/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM - JURY TRIAL REASON: | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CANCELLED- 06/04/2021 AT 10:00 AM - FINAL PRETRIAL REASON: | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COST BILL FILED | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY-CASE SETTLED AND DISMISSED. COSTS TO DEFENDANTS PHILIP ASCHI, D.O. AND SOUTHWESTERN OHIO UROLOGY INC. COPIES TO KATHY DOUGHERTY AND JOSEPH DEBRA AND JUDGE SCOTT NUSBAUM VIA US MAIL. ADDITIONAL FEES TO COMPUTERIZATION FUND PER ORC 2303.201 (B)(1) - $1.00 PER PAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.