Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
1CV20150405Goettke, Richard L vs Thelma's Enterprises, Llc
Foreclosures case was filed in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, OH. Judge JOHN W RUDDUCK presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 23, 2015
Last Refreshed
May 21, 2024
Filing Location
Clinton County, OH
Judge
Category
Foreclosures
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT APPLIED $ 159.80 | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT REFUND IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 59.20 REFUND TO | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | COSTS ASSIGNED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 290.80 TO GOETTKE, RICHARD L | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | COST BILL FILED | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THIRD PARTY PLAINTIF F'S COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT, THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, LLC COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST PLAINTIFF FILED | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DISMISS FILED | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSL (COUNTERCLAIM) FILED | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | ENTRY-COURT INFORMED CASE IS SETTLED. MAY 18, 2017 TELEPHONE PRETRIAL NOW CANCELLED. PLAINTIFF GIVEN UNTIL JUNE 12, 2017 TO FILE DISMISSAL. COPIES TO JUDGE BROGAN, SUSAN DAVIS, JAMES HAVENS, ASLEY MUELLER, KATHRYN CARLISLE- ADDITIONAL FEES TO COMPUTERIZATION FUND PER ORC 2303.201 (B)(1) - $1.00 PER PAGE KESLING ALL VIA US MAIL, TO RICHARD GOETTKE AND DANIELLE SOLLARS, CLINTON CO PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL. | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ENTRY-TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULED MAY 18, 2017 AT 2:00 PM. COPIES TO JUDGE BROGAN, SUSAN DAVIS, JAMES HAVENS, KATHRYN CARLISLE-KESLING VIA US MAIL AND DANIELLE SOLLARS AND RICHARD GOETTKE VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL. ADDITIONAL FEES TO COMPUTERIZATION FUND PER ORC 2303.201 (B)(1) - $1.00 PER PAGE | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANT, THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, LLC COUNTERCLAIM FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN VIA US MAIL. | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ENTRY-ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE AND RESET THE DEPOSITIVE MOTION SCHEDULE AND BENCH TRIAL FILED. COPIES TO SUSAN DAVIS, KATHRYN CARLISLE-KESLING, ADAM SCHWARTZ, ASHLEY MUELLER VIA US MAIL, RICHARD GOETTKE, DANIELLE ADDITIONAL FEES TO COMPUTERIZATION FUND PER ORC 2303.201 (B)(1) - $1.00 PER PAGE SOLLARS VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL. | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERKS FEE FOR RECEIVING FAXED MOTION AND ORDER | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE AND RESET THE DEPOSITVE MOTION SCHEDULE AND BENCH TRIAL FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN VIA US MAIL. | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT, RETURNED AND FILED; THELMA'S ENTERPRISES LLC, 13220 STAFFORD ROAD, LEESBURG, OH 45135, SIGNED ILLEGIBLY 11/09/16. | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | POSTAGE CHARGED ADDITIONAL FEES TO COMPUTERIZATION FUND PER ORC 2303.201 (B)(1) - $1.00 PER PAGE | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN VIA US MAIL. | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CANCELLED- 11/14/2016 AT 9:00 AM - COURT TRIAL REASON: | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | ENTRY-ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN, SUSAN DAVIS, KATHRYN CARLISLE-KESSLING BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING VIA US MAIL, CLINTON CO PROSECUTOR AND RICHARD GOETTKE VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL. ADDITIONAL FEES TO COMPUTERIZATION FUND PER ORC 2303.201 (B)(1) - $1.00 PER PAGE | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | CANCELLED- 11/14/2016 AT 9:00 AM - COURT TRIAL REASON: | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ENTRY-ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER FILED. COPIES TO JUDGE BROGAN, RICHARD GOETTKE, SUSAN DAVIS, KATHRYN CARLISLE-KESLING, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, DANIELLE SOLLARS. ADDITIONAL FEES TO COMPUTERIZATION FUND PER ORC 2303.201 (B)(1) - $1.00 PER PAGE | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING'S MOTION FOR ELAVE TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | FAX/ DEFN BAC | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ENTRY-ORDER GRANTING OHIO TITLE CORP'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE DISPOSITIVE MOTION SCHEDULE AND BENCH TRIAL FILED. COPIES TO KATHRYN CARLISLE-KESLING, RICHARD GOETTKE, SUSAN DAVIS, JUDGE BROGAN, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING I. | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF PLAINTIFF TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FILED - COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERKS FEE FOR RECEIVING FAXED MOTION | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE THE DISPOSITIVE MOTION SCHEDULE AND BENCH TRIAL FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AGAINST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT FILED | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERKS FEE FOR RECEIVING FAXED ANSWER | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF OHIO TITLE CORP TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FILED. COPY SENT TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ENTRY-PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM AND ENTRY FILED. DISPOSITIVE MOTION SCHEDULE AND BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULED. COPIES TO RICHARD GOETTKE, SUSAN DAVIS, KATHRYN CARLISLE-KESLING, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING. | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT, RETURNED AND FILED; KATHRYN J CARLISLE-KESLING BUCKLEY KING, 1400 FIFTH THIRD CENTER, 600 SUPERIOR AVENUE EAST, CLEVELAND, OH 44114-2652 SIGNED J DENNI, NO DATE. | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT, RETURNED AND FILED; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING INC, 7105 CORPORATE DRIVE, PLANO, TX 75024; SIGNED Y WILLIAMS 08/15/16. | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT, RETURNED AND FILED; RICHARD L GOETTKE, 213 N BROADWAY, BLANCHESTER, OH 45107; SIGNED V GOETTKE, 08/15/16 | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT, RETURNED AND FILED; OHIO TITLE CORP, 7085 PEARL ROAD, MIDDLEBURG HEIGHTS, OH 44130; SIGNED A GALLO NO DATE. | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AGAINST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT ISSUED VIA PERSONAL SERVICE - DEPUTY CLERK | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | POSTAGE CHARGED | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | FOUR SUMMONS AGAINST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT ISSUED VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE FILED | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, LLC FILED. COPY SENT TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERKS FEE FOR COPIES TO SERVE | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AGAINST THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT AND COMPLAINT RETURNED AND FILED BY DEPUTY CLERK, CLINTON COUNTY TREASURER OFFICE PERSONALLY SERVED, SIGNED BY JILL L SMITH 08/09/16 | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING- 11/14/2016 AT 9:00 AM - COURT TRIAL | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CHANGE OF LAW FIRM FOR OHIO TITLE CORP FILED BY KATHRYN CARLISLE KESLING | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERKS FEE FOR RECEIVING FAXED MOTION | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ENTRY-COURT GRANTS MOTION. RESPONSIVE PLEADING DUE FROM THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT ON OR BEFORE APRIL 23, 2016. COPIES: RICHARD GOETTKE, SUSAN DAVIS, MATTHEW SUELLENTROP, KATHRYN CARLISLE-KESLING, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, JUDGE BROGAN. | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERKS FEE FOR RECEIVING FAXED NOTICE | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERKS FEE FOR RECEIVING FAXED MOTION | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION OF DEFENDANT OHIO TITLE CORP FOR LEAVE TO PLEAD TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING/ANSWER FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED - KATHRYN J CARLISLE-KESLING FOR OHIO TITLE CORP. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURNED RECEIPT RETURNED AND FILED. BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING INC. 7105 CORPORATE DRIVE. PLANO TX 75024 SIGNATURE: NOT LEGIBLE / NO DATE. | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | TWO SUMMONS WITH COMPLAINT ISSUED VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | POSTAGE CHARGED | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE FILED | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY-ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO JOIN PARTY DEFENDANTS FILED. COPIES TO RICHARD GOETTKE, SUSAN DAVIS, MATTHEW SUELLENTROP, OHIO TITLE CORP AND BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING. | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT FILED - HONORABLE JAMES A BROGAN | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT FILED | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | CROSS-CLAIM OF DEFENDANT THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, LLC FILED. COPY TO JUDGE BROGAN. | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO JOIN PARTY DEFENDANTS FILED | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY-JUDGE JOHN W RUDDUCK RECUSES HIMSELF FROM FURTHER PARTICIPATION IN THIS CASE. COPIES TO RICHARD GOETTKE, SUSAN DAVIS AND MATTHEW SUELLENTROP. | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT RETURNED AND FILED THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, INC. 13220 STAFFORD ROAD, LEESBURG OH 45135 SIGNED ILLEGIBLY, 10/29/15 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, LLC FILED | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | COUNTER CLAIM OF DEFENDANT THELMA'S ENTERPRISES, LLC FILED | |
October 24, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JASON WALT, TREASURER CLINTON COUNTY, OHIO FILED | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | POSTAGE CHARGED | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT APPLIED $ 131.00 | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | FILED: FORECLOSURES | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED AND FILED - CLINTON COUNTY TREASURER'S OFFICE WAS PERSONALLY SERVED TO ANDREA REGAN BY THE CLERK OF COURT'S | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH COPY OF COMPLAINT ATTACHED ISSUED VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH COMPLAINT ATTACHED ISSUED - TO BE SERVED ON THE CLINTON COUNTY TREASURER'S OFFICE BY THE CLERK OF COURT'S OFFICE | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT IN FORECLOSURE FILED | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT - RECEIPT NO. 2086153 IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 350.00 | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL FILING FEE |