Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Edward S. Rosenthal Family Trust Diane Waxman, Executor, Edward S. Rosenthal Family Trust, Diane Waxman, Executor Individually And Derivatively On Behalf Of Nominal Defendant Polaris Seven Eleven, Llc, Luke & Simon Investments, Llc Individually And Derivatively On Behalf Of Nominal Defendant Polaris Seven Eleven, Llc, Thomas Bradley, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brent S Silverman, Phillip A Ciano, against Centre & Craig, Llc, Grazly, Llc, Guy J. Totino, Laura Totino, Polaris Seven Eleven, (total of 6) See All represented by Thomas A Barni, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with PETER J CORRIGAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Docket |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeRe-Assigned |
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER...FILED..
Date: May 19, 2023MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER...FILED.. 10/18/2023 - DENIED
Date: May 19, 2023STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. NOTICE ISSUED
Date: August 14, 2023OPINION & ORDR ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RSTRAINING ORDR & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Date: October 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/01/2023 AT 02:45 PM. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL AND THEN CONTACT THE COURT'S STAFF ATTORNEY AT (216) 443-8589 ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
OPINION & ORDR ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RSTRAINING ORDR & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF JE |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT(S) GUY J. TOTINO(D1), LAURA TOTINO(D2), GRAZLY, LLC(D3) and CENTRE & CRAIG, LLC(D4) ATTORNEY THOMAS A BARNI 0064555 JOINT ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, GUY J. TOTINO, LAURA TOTINO, GRAZLY, LLC AND CENTRE & CRAIG, LLC, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AN |
|
July 31, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL LUKE & SIMON INVESTMENTS, LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANT POLARIS SEVEN ELEVEN, LLC |
||
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT NO. 50692484 RETURNED 06/21/2023 FAILURE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TOTINO/GUY/J. - UNABLE TO FORWARD NOTICE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF(S) ATTORNEY SR |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT NO. 50692486 RETURNED 06/21/2023 FAILURE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GRAZLY, LLC - UNABLE TO FORWARD NOTICE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF(S) ATTORNEY SR |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT NO. 50692485 RETURNED 06/21/2023 FAILURE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TOTINO/LAURA/ - UNABLE TO FORWARD NOTICE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF(S) ATTORNEY SR |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO PLEAD FILED 06/22/2023, DEFENDANTS GUY J. TOTINO, LAURA TOTINO, GRAZLY, LLC, CENTRE & CRAIG, LLC, AND POLARIS SEVEN ELEVEN, LLC ARE GRANTED LEAVE UNTIL NO LATER THAN 07/31/2023 TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
June 23, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL LUKE & SIMON INVESTMENTS, LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANT POLARIS SEVEN ELEVEN, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.