Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RICHARD REESE vs. THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY
A Miscellaneous - Other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH. Judge STEVEN E GALL presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 30, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 04, 2023
Filing Location
Cuyahoga County, OH
Category
MISCELLANEOUS - OTHER
Case Outcome Type
NEWLY FILED
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER DEFENDANT THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER INSTANTER MO |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
CMC BY PHONE HELD ON 11/07/2023. DATES SET AS FOLLOWS: DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 03/29/2024. PLAINTIFF EXPERT REPORTS MUST BE SUBMITTED ON OR BEFORE 04/29/2024. DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT EXPERT REPORTS ON OR BEFORE 05/29/2024. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS MUST BE SUBMITTED ON OR BEFORE 05/10/2024. FINAL PRETRIAL SET FOR 07/24/2024 AT 01:30 PM. TRIAL SET FOR 08/19/2024 AT 09:00 AM. ALL PARTIES ARE TO SUBMIT TO THE COURT TRIAL BRIEF, WITNESS LISTS, JURY INSTRUCTIONS, MOTIONS IN LIMINE, AND STIPULATIONS 7 DAYS BEFORE THE TRIAL. ALL PARTIES ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S STANDING TRIAL ORDERS AVAILABLE AT JUDGE GALL'S WEBPAGE ON THE CUYAHOGA COUNTY COMMON PLEAS COURT WEBSITE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
October 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR BEAN/FRED/M 10/14/2023 17:01:06 SR |
|
October 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR BRENNEMAN/DEBORAH/S 10/14/2023 17:01:06 SR |
|
October 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CMC BY PHONE SET FOR 11/07/2023 AT 03:00 PM. PLAINTIFF SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL WITH ALL PARTIES AND THEN CONTACT THE COURT AT 216-443-8610 AT THE SCHEDULED TIME. SC |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FILED BY D1 THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY ATTORNEY DEBORAH S BRENNEMAN 0062113 DEFENDANT THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AN |
|
October 02, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL RICHARD REESE |
||
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
USPS RECEIPT NO. 51520112 DELIVERED BY USPS 09/12/2023 THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY PROCESSED BY COC 09/20/2023. SR |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
USPS RECEIPT NO. 51520113 DELIVERED BY USPS 09/05/2023 THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY PROCESSED BY COC 09/13/2023. SR |
|
September 02, 2023 |
SUMS COMPLAINT CERTIFIED MAIL THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY COMPLETED |
||
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMS COMPLAINT(51520113) SENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL. TO: THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM R/A 4400 EASTON COMMONS WAY, SUITE 125 COLUMBUS, OH 43219-0000 SR |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMS COMPLAINT(51520112) SENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL. TO: THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY 6600 GRANT AVENUE CLEVELAND, OH 44105 SR |
|
August 31, 2023 |
SUMS COMPLAINT CERTIFIED MAIL THE UNIVERSAL STEEL COMPANY |
||
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED: COMPLAINT, SERVICE REQUEST SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S FEE SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT AMOUNT PAID FRED M BEAN SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT SPECIAL PROJECTS FUND SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
COMPUTER FEE SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT FEE CS |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
LEGAL AID SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
LEGAL NEWS SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS E-FILE COPY COST SR |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
LEGAL RESEARCH SF |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGE STEVEN E GALL ASSIGNED (RANDOM) SF |