Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JEFFREY M BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2023 |
CategoryConsumer Sales Practice |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 14, 2023REPLY TO
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 24, 2023MEMO FILED
Date: September 22, 2023DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: November 02, 2023MEMO CONTRA FILEDNAME:CARL MEDLEYPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PMOTION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: October 17, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: November 01, 2023WITHDRAW PAPER FILINGTIE FILING DATE:08/24/23
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE
Date: September 14, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: October 02, 2023DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: November 03, 2023AMENDED
Date: November 06, 2023MEMO FILED
Date: September 05, 2023CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENTNAME:CARL MEDLEYPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PPRO SE NAME:CARL MEDLEYPRO SE ADDRESS:5260 ABEL MERRIL RDCOLUMBUS, OH 43221MOTION COUNTER:0012 | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMONAME - OF:CARL MEDLEYPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PPRO SE NAME:CARL MEDLEYPRO SE ADDRESS:5260 ABEL MERRIL RDCOLUMBUS, OH 43221MEMO CONTRA | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMO CONTRA FILEDNAME:CARL MEDLEYPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PMOTION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND TIMENAME:CARL MEDLEYPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PPRO SE NAME:CARL MEDLEYPRO SE ADDRESS:5260 ABEL MERRIL RDCOLUMBUS, OH 43221MOTION COUNTER:0011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.