Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
86 DR 000456
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. Judge Dana S. Preisse presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 06, 2012
Last Refreshed
May 19, 2021
Filing Location
Franklin County, OH
Judge
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | MASS TRANFER OF JUDGE LOCATIONOLD COURTROOM::ALMEROLD JUDGE/LOC IND:LNEW COURTROOM::LACKSUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
June 26, 2003 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:879.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :1557.00 | |
June 18, 2003 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:02/11/02SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
June 18, 2003 | Docket Event | REQUEST COSTBILL | |
February 13, 2003 | Docket Event | APPEAL DISMISSED BY COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:02AP163 | |
August 15, 2002 | Docket Event | COST PAID BY DEPOSITAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:7.00INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:150377800PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSON | |
July 01, 2002 | Docket Event | DECISION FROM COURT OF APPEALS | |
July 01, 2002 | Docket Event | ENTRY - COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:01AP1159 | |
June 28, 2002 | Docket Event | CORRECTED RECORD - PREVIOUS RECORD LACKED ITEMSCRT OF APPEALS NO:02AP163CORRECTED RECORD SHEET TO ADD PLEADINGS(1-718) FROM CASE 01AP1159. | |
June 19, 2002 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:879.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :1551.00 | |
June 12, 2002 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:03/08/02SUPR CRT TERM CD:07 | |
June 12, 2002 | Docket Event | REQUEST COSTBILL | |
May 23, 2002 | Docket Event | DECISION/ENTRY | |
May 23, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953NOTICE PRINT DATE:05/24/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/23/02 | |
May 23, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DNOTICE PRINT DATE:05/24/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/23/02 | |
March 11, 2002 | Docket Event | POST DECREE HEARING/EVENT SCHEDULEDDATE - COURTROOM:05/06/02TIME - COURTROOM:10:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 61373 SOUTH HIGH STREET6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MOTION HEARINGNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - DOMESTIC DIVISIONNOTICE MAIL DATE:03/11/02PL ATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOPL ATTORNEY ADDR:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | APPLIED - COMPUTERIZED RESEARCH LEGAL FEESAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:3.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:392635PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:25.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:392632PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT - COURT COMPUTERIZATIONAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:10.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:392635PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | MOTION TO IMPOUNDNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953MOTION COUNTER:0037SUPREME COURT IND:YCSEA CT RM:NACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 06/12/02 | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | APPLIED - COURT FEEAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:30.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:392632PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | APPLIED SECURITY DEPOSIT ON CASEAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:7.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:392635PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event | MEMO IN SUPPORT | |
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS PAPERRECORD CERTIFICATION SHEET WITH PLEADINGS 719-769, CONSOLIDATED 01AP-1159. | |
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event | RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:02AP163 | |
February 25, 2002 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - ORDINARY MAILNAME:SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:200 NORTH HIGH STREETROOM 300COLUMBUS, OH 43215ATTORNEY NAME:CSEA ENFORCEMENTATTORNEY ADDRESS:80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-3275TIE FILING DATE:02/19/02 | |
February 25, 2002 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - ORDINARY MAILNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:(STACKPOLE)1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:CSEA ENFORCEMENTATTORNEY ADDRESS:80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-3275TIE FILING DATE:02/19/02 | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:(STACKPOLE)1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:CSEA ENFORCEMENTATTORNEY ADDRESS:80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-3275NOTICE PRINT DATE:02/22/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:02/19/02LUMP SUM TRANS ORD,CSEA INVST FNDGS,ARR CAL,LETTER | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | FRANKLIN COUNTY CSEA ARREARS CALCULATOR | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | LETTERS | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICEATTORNEY NAME:CSEA ENFORCEMENTATTORNEY ADDRESS:80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-3275 | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | ADDRESS MAINTENANCENAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PADDRESS:(STACKPOLE)1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229OLD ADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLS, OH 43015 | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:200 NORTH HIGH STREETROOM 300COLUMBUS, OH 43215ATTORNEY NAME:CSEA ENFORCEMENTATTORNEY ADDRESS:80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-3275NOTICE PRINT DATE:02/22/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:02/19/02LUMP SUM TRANS ORD,CSEA INVST FNDGS,ARR CAL,LETTER | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | LUMP SUM PAYMENT TRANSMITTAL ORDER | |
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event | CSEA INVESTIGATION FILED | |
February 11, 2002 | Docket Event | COST BILL SENTPAYEE NAME:RUTH STACKPOLEPAYEE ADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA CTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229AMOUNT:70.00UNDETERMINED WHO IS TO PAY COSTS SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. | |
February 11, 2002 | Docket Event | COST PAID BY DEPOSITAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:67.00INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:150019100PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSON | |
February 11, 2002 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 11, 2002 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES DECISIONNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DPRO SE NAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPRO SE ADDRESS:3056 GANNETT AVECOLUMBUS, OH 43231MOTION COUNTER:0036SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 06/18/03 | |
February 11, 2002 | Docket Event | COST BILL SENTPAYEE NAME:RICHARD PEDERSONPAYEE ADDRESS:3056 GANNETT AVECOLUMBUS, OH 43231AMOUNT:70.00UNDETERMINED WHO IS TO PAY COSTS SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. | |
February 11, 2002 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
February 11, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED - COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:02AP163NAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:D | |
February 07, 2002 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:804.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :1461.00 | |
January 30, 2002 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - ORDINARY MAILNAME:ROBERT BRACCOPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:3262 W HENDERSON RDSTE ACOLUMBUS, OH 43220ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000TIE FILING DATE:01/28/02 | |
January 30, 2002 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - ORDINARY MAILNAME:RUTH STACKPOLEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA CTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000TIE FILING DATE:01/28/02 | |
January 30, 2002 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - ORDINARY MAILNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:3056 GANNETT AVECOLUMBUS, OH 43231ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000TIE FILING DATE:01/28/02 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953NOTICE PRINT DATE:01/29/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:01/28/02 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | FORM 1 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM WITHOLDING NOTICE | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO INCOME PROVIDER | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE DECISION | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DNOTICE PRINT DATE:01/29/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:01/28/02 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | REPORT OF REFEREE - ADOPTED | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICEATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:10/10/01SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:RUTH STACKPOLEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA CTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000NOTICE PRINT DATE:01/29/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:01/28/02FORM 1,NTC | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | ADDRESS MAINTENANCENAME:ROBERT BRACCOPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NADDRESS:3262 W HENDERSON RDSTE ACOLUMBUS, OH 43220OLD ADDRESS:3262 W HENDERSON RDSUITE ACOLS, OH 43220 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:3056 GANNETT AVECOLUMBUS, OH 43231ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000NOTICE PRINT DATE:01/29/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:01/28/02JDGMNT ENTRY,MAG DEC,SPPT WRKSHT,FORM 1,NTC,ADDNDM | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:ROBERT BRACCOPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:3262 W HENDERSON RDSTE ACOLUMBUS, OH 43220ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000NOTICE PRINT DATE:01/29/02NOTICE MAIL DATE:01/28/02JDGMNT ENTRY,MAG DEC,SPPT WRKSHT,FORM 1,NTC,ADDNDM | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | ADDRESS MAINTENANCENAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DADDRESS:3056 GANNETT AVECOLUMBUS, OH 43231OLD ADDRESS:3056 GANNETTCOLUMBUS, OH 43231 | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | REQUEST COSTBILL | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:10/25/00SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | ENTRYAPPELLEE'S STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TOAPPELLATE RULE 9 C | |
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNOTICE PRINT DATE:12/27/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:12/26/01 | |
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953NOTICE PRINT DATE:12/27/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:12/26/01 | |
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD OF APPEALSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD SHEET TO ADD 9(C)STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE AND PROCEEDINGS TO THE RECORD. | |
December 04, 2001 | Docket Event | EXHIBITSCASSETTE TAPE | |
December 04, 2001 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET FILED | |
December 04, 2001 | Docket Event | DEPOSITION - FILEDNAME:RONALD E KENDRICKDATE - DEPOSITION:11/16/01 | |
December 03, 2001 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER CERTIFICATE FILEDCOURTROOM RPRT ID:LOSCDATE TRANSCRIBED:11/27/01NO. OF DAYS:0010 | |
November 27, 2001 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
November 27, 2001 | Docket Event | MEMO FILED | |
November 27, 2001 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:25.00HOW PAID IND:1INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:387224PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
November 20, 2001 | Docket Event | ORDERSTIPULATION OF STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO APPELLATE RULE 9(C) | |
November 20, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DNOTICE PRINT DATE:11/20/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:11/20/01 | |
November 20, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953NOTICE PRINT DATE:11/20/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:11/20/01 | |
October 26, 2001 | Docket Event | RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:01AP1159 | |
October 26, 2001 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS PAPERRECORD CERTIFICATION SHEET WITH 718 PLEADINGS,1 TRANS, 1 ENVELOPE EXHIBITS. | |
October 12, 2001 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:10/12/01SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
October 12, 2001 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - PRO SENAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PPRO SE NAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPRO SE ADDRESS:(STACKPOLE)1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229 | |
October 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Motion for ContinuanceNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PPRO SE NAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPRO SE ADDRESS:(STACKPOLE)1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229MOTION COUNTER:0035SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NREASON CONTINUED:OTHERACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 10/12/01 | |
October 12, 2001 | Docket Event | CONTINUANCE ORDER | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | POST DECREE CONTINUANCEDATE - COURTROOM:02/06/02TIME - COURTROOM:10:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 61373 SOUTH HIGH STREET6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MOTION HEARINGNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - DOMESTIC DIVISIONDATE- PREV HEARNG:10/10/01TIME- PREV HEARNG:10:00 AMNOTICE MAIL DATE:10/10/01PL ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEPL ATTORNEY ADDR:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | ENTRY | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/12/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/10/01 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DNOTICE PRINT DATE:10/12/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/10/01 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED - COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:01AP1159NAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | DOCKETING STATEMENT FILEDCRT OF APPEALS NO:01AP1159NAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PDOCKET INDICATOR:A | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNOTICE PRINT DATE:10/12/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/10/01 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | APPLIED - COURT FEEAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:30.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:384733PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | APPLIED SECURITY DEPOSIT ON CASEAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:7.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:384733PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:25.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:384733PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | APPLIED - COMPUTERIZED RESEARCH LEGAL FEESAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:3.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:384733PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STAYNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953MOTION COUNTER:0034SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 01/28/02 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | CONTEMPT OF COURT ONNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT - COURT COMPUTERIZATIONAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:10.00HOW PAID IND:2INTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:384733PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | MEMO IN SUPPORT | |
October 10, 2001 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
September 28, 2001 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - ORDINARY MAILNAME:ROBERT BRACCOPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSTE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000TIE FILING DATE:09/25/01 | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | CONTINUANCE ORDER | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | Motion for ContinuanceNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DPRO SE NAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPRO SE ADDRESS:3056 GANNETT AVECOLUMBUS, OH 43231MOTION COUNTER:0032SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NREASON CONTINUED:VACATIONACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 09/25/01 | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:ROBERT BRACCOPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSTE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000NOTICE PRINT DATE:09/27/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:09/25/01MTN,ENTRY FOR CONT | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICEATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000 | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | ADDRESS MAINTENANCENAME:ROBERT BRACCOPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NADDRESS:1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSTE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220OLD ADDRESS:3662 W HENDERSON RDSUITE ACOLS, OH 43220 | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:09/25/01SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | Motion for ContinuanceNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:JUDGE PREISSEATTORNEY ADDRESS:JUDGE Dana Preisse373 SOUTH HIGH ST.6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000MOTION COUNTER:0033SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NREASON CONTINUED:OTHERACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 09/25/01 | |
September 24, 2001 | Docket Event | POST DECREE CONTINUANCEDATE - COURTROOM:11/27/01TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 36373 SOUTH HIGH STREET3RD FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MODIFY SUPPORTNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - DOMESTIC DIVISIONDATE- PREV HEARNG:10/04/01TIME- PREV HEARNG:09:30 AMNOTICE MAIL DATE:09/24/01DF PRO SE NAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONDF PRO SE ADDRESS:3056 GANNETT AVECOLUMBUS, OH 43231 | |
September 24, 2001 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:08/09/01DATE - COURTROOM:10/04/01TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 36373 SOUTH HIGH STREET3RD FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
September 19, 2001 | Docket Event | POST DECREE CONTINUANCEDATE - COURTROOM:10/10/01TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 61373 SOUTH HIGH STREET6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MOTION HEARINGNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - DOMESTIC DIVISIONDATE- PREV HEARNG:09/19/01TIME- PREV HEARNG:09:00 AMNOTICE MAIL DATE:09/19/01PL ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEPL ATTORNEY ADDR:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486 | |
August 09, 2001 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS PAPERRESPINSE AND CASE STATUS SYNOPSIS | |
August 09, 2001 | Docket Event | CONTINUANCE ORDER | |
August 09, 2001 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/09/01SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
August 09, 2001 | Docket Event | Motion for ContinuanceNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESATTORNEY ADDRESS:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000MOTION COUNTER:0031SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NREASON CONTINUED:OTHERACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 08/09/01 | |
August 09, 2001 | Docket Event | POST DECREE CONTINUANCEDATE - COURTROOM:10/04/01TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 36373 SOUTH HIGH STREET3RD FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MODIFY SUPPORTNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - DOMESTIC DIVISIONDATE- PREV HEARNG:08/09/01TIME- PREV HEARNG:09:30 AMNOTICE MAIL DATE:08/09/01PL ATTORNEY NAME:DOMESTIC MAGISTRATESPL ATTORNEY ADDR:DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT 3RD FLOOR373 SOUTH HIGH STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(000) 000-0000ACTION HAS BEEN STRICKEN | |
August 09, 2001 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
June 21, 2001 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF FAILURE OF SERVICE NOTICE FILEDATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/21/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/18/01 | |
June 18, 2001 | Docket Event | SERVICE FAILED - CERTIFIEDTIE FILING DATE:05/22/01REASON FAIL DESC:UNCLAIMEDADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486NOTICE PRINTED ON 06/21/01 | |
May 30, 2001 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:05/22/01DATE - SERVICE:05/24/01NAME:RICHARD J PEDERSON | |
May 25, 2001 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - PROCESS SERVERTIE FILING DATE:05/17/01DATE - SERVICE:05/22/01NAME:RUTH A PEDERSON | |
May 22, 2001 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGCERTIFIED MAIL NO:699000237425ADDRESS:3056 GANNETTCOLUMBUS, OH 43221ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486TIE FILING DATE:05/14/01RETURNED - SERVED ON 05/24/01 | |
May 22, 2001 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGCERTIFIED MAIL NO:699000237432ADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486TIE FILING DATE:05/14/01RETURNED - NOT SERVED | |
May 18, 2001 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:704.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :1286.00 | |
May 17, 2001 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - PROCESS SERVERNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486TIE FILING DATE:05/14/01RETURNED - SERVED ON 05/22/01 | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DNOTICE PRINT DATE:05/16/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/14/01 | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICEATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486 | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | ADDRESS MAINTENANCENAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229OLD ADDRESS:1669 AMERICAN COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229 | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SEEK EMPLOYMENT | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953NOTICE PRINT DATE:05/16/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/14/01 | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - REGISTERED MAILNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486NOTICE PRINT DATE:05/16/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/14/01AJE & ORD TO SEEK EMPLOY | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUIRED NOTICE | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - PROCESS SERVERNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486NOTICE PRINT DATE:05/16/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/14/01AJE & ORD TO SEEK EMPLOY | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUEST COSTBILL | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:3056 GANNETTCOLUMBUS, OH 43221ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486NOTICE PRINT DATE:05/21/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/14/01AGRD JUD ENTRY,ORD TO SEEK EMPLOY,ADDNDM | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - REGISTERED MAILNAME:RICHARD J PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:3056 GANNETTCOLUMBUS, OH 43221ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486NOTICE PRINT DATE:05/16/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/14/01AJE & ORD TO SEEK EMPLOY | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/15/00SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:1668 AMERICANA COURTCOLUMBUS, OH 43229ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486NOTICE PRINT DATE:05/21/01NOTICE MAIL DATE:05/14/01AGRD JUD ENTRY,ORD TO SEEK EMPLOY,ADDNDM | |
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event | CONTINUANCE ORDER | |
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF AGREEMENT | |
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:03/16/01SUPR CRT TERM CD:00 | |
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41 (B) (1) | |
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event | Motion for ContinuanceNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486MOTION COUNTER:0029SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NREASON CONTINUED:OTHERACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 03/16/01 | |
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event | Motion for ContinuanceNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953MOTION COUNTER:0030SUPREME COURT IND:NCSEA CT RM:NREASON CONTINUED:OTHERACTION HAS BEEN GRANTED ON 03/16/01 | |
March 16, 2001 | Docket Event | POST DECREE HEARING/EVENT SCHEDULEDDATE - COURTROOM:08/09/01TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 36373 SOUTH HIGH STREET3RD FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MODIFY SUPPORTNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - DOMESTIC DIVISIONNOTICE MAIL DATE:03/16/01PL ATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT BRACCOPL ATTORNEY ADDR:ATTORNEY AT LAW1170 OLD HENDERSON RDSUITE 109COLUMBUS, OH 43220(614) 442-1953 | |
March 15, 2001 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILEDNAME:RUTH A PEDERSONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEATTORNEY ADDRESS:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486 | |
March 15, 2001 | Docket Event | POST DECREE HEARING/EVENT SCHEDULEDDATE - COURTROOM:09/19/01TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 61373 SOUTH HIGH STREET6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MOTION HEARINGNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - DOMESTIC DIVISIONNOTICE MAIL DATE:03/15/01PL ATTORNEY NAME:RODNEY B TEAGUEPL ATTORNEY ADDR:FR CNTY CHILD SUPPORT80 EAST FULTON STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-5147(614) 525-4486 |