Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kirk Angela Marshall, against Deborah Bramer Aka Deborah A Bramer Aka Debra A Br, James Bramer Aka James Z Bramer, Jane Doe Name Unknown The Unknown Spouse Of James Bramer Aka James Z B, John Doe Name Unknown The Unknown Spouse Of Deborah Bramer Aka Debra A, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc As Mortgagee As Nomin, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with CHRISTOPHER A WAGNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2023 |
CategoryE511 - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY PROCESS SERVER TO DEBORAH BRAMER AKA DEBORAH A BRAMER AKA DEBRA A BR
Date: December 01, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED BY PROCESS SERVER TO JAMES BRAMER AKA JAMES Z BRAMER
Date: December 01, 2023CLASSIFICATION FORM FILED.
Date: November 29, 2023COMPLAINT FILED
Date: November 29, 2023PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT
Date: November 30, 2023NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT
Date: December 04, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH WAIVER TO JAMES BRAMER AKA JAMES Z BRAMER
Date: December 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS MORTGAGEE AS NOMIN ON 12/04/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 1003 3143] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO DEBORAH BRAMER AKA DEBORAH A BRAMER AKA DEBRA A BR ON 12/04/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 1003 3105] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO JAMES BRAMER AKA JAMES Z BRAMER ON 12/05/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 1003 3112] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBORAH BRAMER AKA DEBRA A ON 12/04/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 1003 3136] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE ASSIGNED CASE ROLLED TO WAGNER/CHRISTOPHER/A PRIMARY | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY PROCESS SERVER TO DEBORAH BRAMER AKA DEBORAH A BRAMER AKA DEBRA A BR DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY PROCESS SERVER TO JAMES BRAMER AKA JAMES Z BRAMER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.