Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HAYES ET AL VS JENKINS ET AL
A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lucas County, OH. Judge JOSEPH V MCNAMARA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 10, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 15, 2024
Filing Location
Lucas County, OH
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves multiple causes of action related to a car accident on May 13, 2022, where Plaintiffs Darell Hayes, Dionna Hayes, and their minor children were injured. The complaint includes claims of negligence against Defendants Bryant…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
5/10/2024 - OPN:COMPLAINT FILED - 1510 - G-4801-CI-0202402379-000 - E-Jour
Date: May 10, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
SRV:SUMM & COMPLT ISSUED SUMMONS AND COPY OF COMPLAINT SENT CERTIFIED MAIL # \n \nBRYANT E JENKINS\n9162 CORDUROY ROAD\n CURTICE, OH 43412 \n7007 0710 0005 1243 3992 \n \nDONALD ROBINSON \n920 UTICA STREET \nTOLEDO, OH 43608 \n7007 0710 0005 1243 4005 \n \nSAFE AUTO INSURANCE GROUP \n4 EASTON OVAL \nCOLUMBUS, OH 43219-6010 \n7007 0710 0005 1243 4012 \nPARTY : P1 - HAYES DARELL |
|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 5/13/2024 - FRM:CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED - 6835 - G-4801-CI-0202402379-000 - E-Jour | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FRM:CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | OPN:COMPLAINT FILED | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | EVT:CASE DESIGNATION FRM FILED | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 5/10/2024 - OPN:COMPLAINT FILED - 1510 - G-4801-CI-0202402379-000 - E-Jour | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EVT:CASE DESIGNATION FRM FILED PARTY : P1 - HAYES DARELL |