Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK -VS- JOHN DOE(S)
On October 14, 2022 a civil case (converted over) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH. Judge Collier, Christopher J. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2023
Filing Location
Medina County, OH
Category
Civil Case (Converted Over)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Work Sheet | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued Civil | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Plt's Claims | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication Filed | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Death | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer of the Medina County Treasurer | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Cover Letter, Copy of Cover Letter & Legal Notice Sent to | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Service by Publication | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Cover Letter & Legal Notice Sent to Medina County Gazette | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Service Completed on | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Preliminary Judicial Report Filed | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Sent Return Receipt Requested | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Filed | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Designation Form | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL SENT RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SENT TO JOHN DOE(S) NAME(S) UNKNOWN (1695 81) MEDINA COUNTY TREASURER (1695 74) |