Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Civil Case (Converted Over) case in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Collier, Christopher J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Case (Converted Over) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued Civil | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Work Sheet | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Dismissal Filed | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Failure of Service Mailed to Atty | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Returned on | |
October 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Service Completed on | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Filed | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Instructions for Service | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.