Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IH Credit Union, Inc vs. Brown, Tina N JNP Open
On August 25, 2023 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami County. Judge Pratt, Jeannine N presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 25, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2023
Filing Location
Miami County, OH
Category
Other Civil
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Failure Of Service Sent To W D Shane Latham | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Failed Method : Fedex Issued : 08/25/2023 Service : Summons on Complaint Served : Return : 09/22/2023 on : Brown, Tina N Signed By : Reason : UnSuccessful - Fedex Comment : customer not available or business closed Tracking #: 000001583 | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Failed Method : Fedex Issued : 08/25/2023 Service : Summons on Complaint Served : Return : 09/22/2023 on : Smith, Jonathan P Signed By : Reason : UnSuccessful - Fedex Comment : customer not available or business closed Tracking #: 000001584 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Return Receipt Fedex # Method : Fedex Issued : 09/11/2023 Service : Summons on Complaint Served : 09/12/2023 Return : 09/13/2023 on : Brown, Tina N Signed By : T Brown Reason : Successful - Fedex Comment : Tracking #: 000001607 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Fedex Issued RE-ISSUED DUE TO WRONG ATTORNEY'S NAME WAS ON THE FIRST SUMMONS Issue Date: 09/11/2023 Service: Summons on Complaint Method: Fedex Cost Per: 20.0000 Tina N Brown Mailing Address 1013 Harrison Avenue Greenville, OH 45331 Tracking Number: 000001607 Jonathan P Smith Mailing Address 1013 Harrison Avenue Greenville, OH 45331 Tracking Number: 000001608 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, Copy Of Complaint Issued | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, Copy Of Complaint | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Deposit Receipt: 181394 Date: 08/25/2023 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit of Tina N. Brown | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit of Jonathan P. Smith | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Fees Paid Pursuant To Orc 2303.201(B) And Legal Research Fees Receipt: 181394 Date: 08/25/2023 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Fees For Computerization Of Clerk's Office Receipt: 181394 Date: 08/25/2023 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Fedex Issued Issue Date: 08/25/2023 Service: Summons on Complaint Method: Fedex Cost Per: 20.0000 Tina N Brown Mailing Address 1013 Harrison Avenue Greenville, OH 45331 Tracking Number: 000001583 Jonathan P Smith Mailing Address 1013 Harrison Avenue Greenville, OH 45331 Tracking Number: 000001584 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Special Projects Account Civil Petitions, Other Than Domestic Relations Receipt: 181394 Date: 08/25/2023 |