Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAURIE CHAPPARS vs DAYTON CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER
On March 07, 2014 an other tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. Judge Richard S. Skelton presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 07, 2014
Last Refreshed
December 12, 2023
Filing Location
Montgomery County, OH
Category
RAYMOND C. WONG MD
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
MOTION: EXTEND TIME OF DEADLINES FILED BY SUSAN BLASIK-MILLER
Date: Feb 10, 2015NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DR. RAYMOND C. WONG FILED BY ELISA PIZZINO
Date: Nov 11, 2014MOTION: LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY FILED BY ELISA PIZZINO
Date: Sep 15, 2014MOTION: EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE BRIEF FILED BY Elisa Pizzino
Date: Jul 07, 2014NOTICE: APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY Elisa Pizzino
Date: Jul 07, 2014CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 03/10/2014 07:59:44.98
Date: Mar 10, 2014CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY RICHARD SKELTON
Date: Mar 07, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL REFUND RICHARD S SKELTON $104.00 | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: WONG MD, RAYMOND C. was sent bill for $166.50. Printed on 05/27/2015 15:45:44.61. | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: DAYTON CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER was sent bill for $166.50. Printed on 05/27/2015 15:45:30.25. | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE EXTENDING DEADLINES Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION: EXTEND TIME OF DEADLINES FILED BY SUSAN BLASIK-MILLER | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE FEBRUARY 13, 2015 AND MOVANTS' RESPONSE DUE FEBRUARY 27, 2015 Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER: PROTECTIVE Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANTS FILED BY ELISA PIZZINO | |
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DR. RAYMOND C. WONG FILED BY ELISA PIZZINO | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE ON NOVEMBER 12, 2014 AT 9:00 AM Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | DECISION GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY CONTINUANCE Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | DECISION SUSTAINING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION: LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY FILED BY ELISA PIZZINO | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE BY DEFENDANTS DAYTON CHILDRENS HOSPITAL AND RAYMOND C. WOND, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY SUSAN BLASIK-MILLER | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION: EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY SUSAN BLASIK-MILLER | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE GRANTING PLAINTIFF EXTENSION UNTIL 9/2/14 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF FILED BY ELISA PIZZINO | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF PLAINTIFF, LAURIE CHAPPARS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY ELISA PIZZINO | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER: GRANTING PLAINTIFF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE BRIEF Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION: EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE BRIEF FILED BY Elisa Pizzino | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE: APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY Elisa Pizzino | |
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION: SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANTS DAYTON CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AND RAYMOND C. WONG, MD FILED BY SUSAN BLASIK-MILLER | |
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION: WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, LAURIE CHAPPARS FILED BY Richard Skelton | |
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, LAURIE CHAPPARS Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 28, 2014 AT 9:00 AM Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE CERTIFEID MAIL (NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD) (REFUSED ON 3/12/14 NO LONGER AT DAYTON CHILDDRENS) (ALL PAPERWORK RETURNED - NO GREEN CARD WAS ATTACHED RETURNED SUMMONS) ON RAYMOND C WONG MD, DAYTON CHILDRENS MEDICAL CTR, CHILDRENS MEDICAL CTR STAT AGT, ONE CHILDRENS PLAZA, DAYTON, OH 45404-1815 - TRACKING #71042230169022016448 - ** The image associated with this docket entry may have a time stamp that reflects the year 2013 instead of 2014. The correct year is 2014, the docket entry indicates the proper year. ** | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 24, 2014 AT 9:15 AM Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DAYTON CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER AND RAYMOND WONG, M.D.; JURY DEMAND FILED BY Susan Blasik-Miller | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Method : CIVIL AREA 2 CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 03/10/2014 Service : CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Served : 03/13/2014 Return : 03/13/2014 On : WONG MD, RAYMOND C. Signed By : KEITH BOSTEK Reason : CIVIL SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Comment : Tracking #: 7104223016902201644 ** The image associated with this docket entry may have a time stamp that reflects the year 2013 instead of 2014. The correct year is 2014, the docket entry indicates the proper year. ** | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Method : CIVIL AREA 2 CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 03/10/2014 Service : CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Served : 03/13/2014 Return : 03/13/2014 On : DAYTON CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER Signed By : KEITH BOSTEK Reason : CIVIL SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Comment : Tracking #: 7104223016902201643 ** The image associated with this docket entry may have a time stamp that reflects the year 2013 instead of 2014. The correct year is 2014, the docket entry indicates the proper year. ** | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT TRANSFER FROM JUDGE TUCKER TO JUDGE O'CONNELL (RE-FILING) Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 03/10/2014 07:59:44.98 | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 03/10/2014 Service: CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Method: CIVIL AREA 2 CERTIFIED MAIL Cost Per: $ 7.00 DAYTON CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER STATUTORY AGENT ONE CHILDRENS PLAZA DAYTON, OH 45404-1815 Tracking No: 7104223016902201643 WONG MD, RAYMOND C. DAYTON CHILDRENS MEDICAL CTR CHILDRENS MEDICAL CTR STAT AGT ONE CHILDRENS PLAZA DAYTON, OH 45404-1815 Tracking No: 7104223016902201644 Receipt: 1051241 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt 1051241 reversed by 1051245 on 06/15/2015. Receipt: 1051248 Date: 06/15/2015 Receipt: 1051252 Date: 06/15/2015 | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY Richard Skelton | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT Receipt: 968440 Date: 03/07/2014 WITH JURY DEMAND FILED BY Richard Skelton | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY Richard Skelton | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT Receipt: 968440 Date: 03/07/2014 | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CONVENIENCE FEE Receipt: 968440 Date: 03/07/2014 |