Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF OHIO vs JAY D. FAULKNER
On September 10, 2019 a riverside case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. Judge Richard S. Skelton presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2019
Last Refreshed
June 10, 2021
Filing Location
Montgomery County, OH
Category
5017 CHESWICK CT APTB
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | WARRANT RETURNED FROM AGENCY | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | ALERT CANCELED FELONY WARRANT ISSUED canceled on: 09/24/2019 For: FAULKNER, JAY D. | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | TERMINATION ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE MESSHAM - CASE DISMISSED - IGNORED BY THE GRAND JURY. | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISP - DISMISSED | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT CREATED WARRANT RECALL Sent on: 09/24/2019 09:40:14.88 | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR VISITING JUDGE FILED | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ENTRY REVOKING TPO - ISSUED BY JUDGE RICHARD S SKELTON | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | BOND SET Arrest Bond Added to Case with: Action Code: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Arrest Date: 09/10/2019 Custody Location: NOT IN CUSTODY Bond Status: BOND ORDERED Status Date: 09/10/2019 Blanket Bond: No Okay to Apply: No Bond Type: CASH/SURETY Bond Amount: 25000 | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | FELONY WARRANT ISSUED FELONY WARRANT ISSUED created on: 09/10/2019 For: FAULKNER, JAY D. | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | FELONY COURT COSTS Charge #1: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE |