Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF OKLAHOMA VS. TOLBERT, WILLIAM TODD
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Carter County, OK. Judge MORRIS, DENNIS presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 30, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 18, 2023
Filing Location
Carter County, OK
Filing Court House
carter County
Judge
Status
Dismissal
Case Documents
CM-JUDGE MORRIS, FILED-CASE DISMISSED WITH COSTS
Date: Sep 20, 2023ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE, FILED
Date: Aug 29, 2023MOTION TO CONTINUE, FILED
Date: Aug 28, 2023CM JUDGE MORRIS, FILED
Date: Jul 19, 2023STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER LAB REPORT AS EVIDENCE, FILED
Date: Jul 17, 2023CM-JUDGE MORRIS, FILED-PLEA SET FOR 07-19-23 9AM
Date: Jul 17, 2023CM JUDGE MORRIS, FILED. SET FOR DOCKET CALL 07/17/2023 AT 9 AM
Date: Jun 14, 2023COURT MINUTE JUDGE MORRIS, FILED
Date: Jun 08, 2023STATES DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE, FILED
Date: Jun 01, 2023STATES DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE,FILED
Date: May 31, 2023REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT,FILED
Date: May 31, 2023WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION HEARING W/ORDER,FILED
Date: May 23, 2023SUBPOENA RETD FILED
Date: Mar 13, 2023SUBPOENA ISSUED CARTER CO.
Date: Mar 07, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE WITH ORDER,FILED
Date: Mar 07, 2023PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE, FILED
Date: Mar 02, 2023AMENDED INFORMATION,FILED
Date: Mar 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DELIVERY, FILED
Date: Mar 01, 2023ORDER OF RELEASE
Date: Feb 02, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INVOCATION
Date: Feb 02, 2023APPEARANCE BOND
Date: Feb 02, 2023COURT MINUTE JUDGE BROOKS, FILED
Date: Feb 02, 2023APPEARANCE BOND
Date: Feb 02, 2023COURT MINUTE JUDGE BROOKS, FILED
Date: Feb 02, 2023INFORMATION, FILED
Date: Jan 30, 2023INFORMATION, FILED
Date: Jan 30, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CM-JUDGE MORRIS, FILED-CASE DISMISSED WITH COSTS | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED W/COST LAW LIBRARY FEE SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE ON ARRESTS |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE, FILED | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE, FILED | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INVOCATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, FILED | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CM JUDGE MORRIS, FILED | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER LAB REPORT AS EVIDENCE, FILED | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CM-JUDGE MORRIS, FILED-PLEA SET FOR 07-19-23 @ 9AM | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CM JUDGE MORRIS, FILED. SET FOR DOCKET CALL 07/17/2023 AT 9 AM | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTE JUDGE MORRIS, FILED DEFT. PLEADS NOT GUILTY. TRIAL SET FOR: 5/1/2023 PLEA SET FOR:06-14-23 # 9AM SET FOR DOCKET CALL:APRIL 14 ,2023 @ 9:00 A.M. JUDGE ASSIGNED:DM DEFT. WITH/WITHOUT COUNSEL: |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | STATE'S DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE, FILED | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | STATE'S DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE,FILED | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT,FILED | |
May 23, 2023 | hearing | WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION HEARING W/ORDER,FILED | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RET'D & FILED | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA ISSUED CARTER CO. (Entry with fee only) |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE WITH ORDER,FILED | |
March 02, 2023 | hearing | PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE, FILED | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION,FILED | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DELIVERY, FILED | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WITHOUT | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF RELEASE | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INVOCATION | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPEARANCE BOND POWER NUMBER: A25-1120 ENTER BONDSMAN NAME: PHILLIP & KEITH EGGENBERG ENTER BOND AMOUNT: $50,000 |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTE JUDGE BROOKS, FILED PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATE:03-02-23 @9AM BOND:50,000 CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, FILED WARRANT,FILED |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE BOND | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTE JUDGE BROOKS, FILED PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATE:03-02-23 @9AM BOND:50,000 CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, FILED |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION, FILED | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION, FILED 10% OF AFS5,CLT9,MLRF,DARF,CHS,AG,CAMA,FORE (Entry with fee only) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM - 7/1/04 LAW LIBRAY SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT CLT9 AFS5 STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND DA REVOLVING FUND CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNTY ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT TRAUMA CARE ADDITIONAL RV FOR DACF (7/1/2016 LEGISLATIVE UPDATE) 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL RV FOR CLEET (AUGUST, 2017) ADDITIONAL RV FOR FORENSIC (NOV, 2017) ADDITIONAL RV FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) POWER NUMBER: A25-1120 ENTER BONDSMAN NAME: PHILLIP & KEITH EGGENBERG ENTER BOND AMOUNT: $50,000 |