Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Carter County, OK, . Carter County, OK Superior Courts carter County with MORRIS, DENNIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCarter County, OK |
|
Filing Court Housecarter County |
FELONY INFORMATION, FILED
Date: June 20, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INVOCATION O
Date: July 11, 2023COURT MINUTE JUDGE BROOKS, FILED
Date: June 21, 2023APPEARANCE BOND
Date: June 21, 2023ORDER OF RELEASE, FILED
Date: June 21, 2023CM JUDGE MORRIS, FILED. PHC CONTINUED TO 8/31/23 AT 9 AM
Date: August 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | Hearing | PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE, FILED | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CM JUDGE MORRIS, FILED. PHC CONTINUED TO 8/31/23 AT 9 AM | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INVOCATION O CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, FILED |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTE JUDGE BROOKS, FILED | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPEARANCE BOND POWER NUMBER: A11-2147 ENTER BONDSMAN NAME: KEITH EGGENBERG ENTER BOND AMOUNT: $850. PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATE: 08-17-23 @9AM BOND: STANDS |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF RELEASE, FILED | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | PROBALE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT, FILED | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
FELONY INFORMATION, FILED 10% OF AFS5,CLT9,FORE,DPSR,MLRF,TCRF,DARF,CHS,AG,CAMA (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY FEE TRAUMA CARE DA REVOLVING FUND DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY REVOLVING FUND ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT ADDITIONAL RV FOR DACF (7/1/2016 LEGISLATIVE UPDATE) 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND DPS IMPAIRED DRIVER DATABASE FEE 10% TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL RV FOR CLEET (AUGUST, 2017) ADDITIONAL RV FOR FORENSIC (NOV, 2017) ADDITIONAL RV FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.