Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PB-2022-00113
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Creek County, OK. Judge Douglas W. Golden presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 19, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 15, 2023
Filing Location
Creek County, OK
Judge
Case Documents
PETITIONER HEIRS AND DEVISEES MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: Sep 13, 2023PETITIONER DANIEL CHAD REYNOLDS RESPONSE TO CONTESTANT
Date: Sep 07, 2023ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: Sep 07, 2023MOTION TO COMPEL PURSUANT TO 12 OS 3237 AND MOTION TO
Date: Sep 01, 2023CM:DG:NO CSR- 6/19/2023- STATUS CONFERENCE- MATTER IS
Date: Jul 06, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: May 18, 2023CM:DG:NO CSR:4-3-23: STATUS CONFERENCE. MATTER IS
Date: Apr 14, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: Apr 13, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO ANCILLARY PETITION
Date: Feb 22, 2023AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: Feb 14, 2023ANCILLARY PETITION TO VOID DEED
Date: Feb 07, 2023CM:DG:NO CSR: 1/11/2023- PETITION TO ADMIT WILL- MATTER
Date: Jan 11, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: MITCHELL BONDS PLLC
Date: Dec 19, 2022COMBINED RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE
Date: Dec 19, 2022CM:DG:NO CSR- 11/14/2022- PETITION- MATTER IS PASSED TO
Date: Nov 23, 2022ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW: LOEFFLER,
Date: Nov 17, 2022APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD -
Date: Nov 09, 2022ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: Nov 08, 2022AMENDED ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL RECORDS
Date: Nov 04, 2022OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND
Date: Nov 04, 2022APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING THAT RICKY REYNOLDS BE
Date: Nov 04, 2022CM:DG:NO CSR- 10/3/2022- PETITION TO ADMIT WILL- MATTER
Date: Oct 18, 2022ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL RECORDS 3 CERT
Date: Oct 03, 2022MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO PRODUCE MEDICAL RECORDS
Date: Oct 03, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - DEBBRA J GOTTSCHALK FOR RICKY
Date: Sep 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING
Date: Sep 20, 2022PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FORAPPOINTMENT OF
Date: Sep 19, 2022CODICIL TO LAST WILL AD TESTAMENT OF ROBERTA MARIE
Date: Sep 19, 2022ORDER SETTING HEARING OF PETITION TO ADMIT WILL AND
Date: Sep 19, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING OF PETITION TO ADMIT WILL AND
Date: Sep 19, 2022LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ROBERTA MARIE REYNOLDS
Date: Sep 19, 2022SECOND CODICIL TO LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ROBERTA
Date: Sep 19, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER HEIRS AND DEVISEES MOTION IN LIMINE | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DANIEL CHAD REYNOLDS TRIAL BRIEF | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER DANIEL CHAD REYNOLD'S RESPONSE TO CONTESTANT | |
September 07, 2023 | hearing | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL PURSUANT TO 12 OS 3237 AND MOTION TO | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM:DG:NO CSR- 6/19/2023- STATUS CONFERENCE- MATTER IS PASSED TO 9/27/2023 AT 2:00PM AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR TRIAL- DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST IS 8/16/2023- DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE IS 9/8/2023- PRE-MARKED EXHIBITS TO BE EXCHANGED BY 9/8/2023 EXTEND DEADLINES RICKY REYNOLDS'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM:DG:NO CSR:4-3-23: STATUS CONFERENCE. MATTER IS PASSED TO 6-19-23 @ 2PM FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO ANCILLARY PETITION TO VOID DEED |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ANCILLARY PETITION TO VOID DEED | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CM:DG:NO CSR: 1/11/2023- PETITION TO ADMIT WILL- MATTER | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | THE DEPOSITION OF SHANDANOLANDA BURGOS, TAKEN BEFORE | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATIONS TO THE RECORD IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | THE DEPOSITION OF DANIEL CHAD REYNOLDS, TAKEN BEFORE | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: MITCHELL BONDS PLLC | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMBINED RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPLICATION TO ISSUE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ACCESS TO DECEDENT'S HOME PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPLICATION TO ISSUE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED HEREIN ON NOVEMBER 4, 2022 MELISSA RUTLEDGE, CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER IN AND FOR THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA , ON THE 14TH DAY OF OCTOBER, 2022, AT 221 E. DEWEY, IN THE CITY OF SAPULPA, COUNTY OF CREEK, AND STATE OF OKLAHOMA, PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATIONS OF THE PARTIES MELISSA RUTLEDGE, CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER IN AND FOR THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA , ON THE 14TH DAY OF OCTOBER, 2022, AT 221 E. DEWEY, IN THE CITY OF SAPULPA, COUNTY OF CREEK, AND STATE OF OKLAHOMA, PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATIONS OF THE PARTIES IS PASSED TO 4/3/2023 AT 2:00 FOR STATUS CONFERENCE- COURT ORDERS THAT PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST BY 2/15/2023- COURT SETS DISCOVERY CUT-OFF OF FRIDAY 3/10/2023 AT 5:00 PM. |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CM:DG:NO CSR- 11/14/2022- PETITION- MATTER IS PASSED TO | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW: LOEFFLER, | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD - LOEFFLER, ALLEN & HAM ALLEN, AND HAM WEDNESDAY 1/11/2023 AT 9:30AM AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL- SAM ALLEN WILL SUBMIT ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL |
|
November 08, 2022 | hearing | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL RECORDS | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPLICATION TO ISSUE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY PROVIDED KEYS AND ANYTHING ELSE NECESSARY TO ENTER HOME AND TO LIMIT ACCES TO SAID HOME |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING THAT RICKY REYNOLDS BE | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM:DG:NO CSR- 10/3/2022- PETITION TO ADMIT WILL- MATTER IS PASSED TO 11/14/2022 AT 2:00PM- COURT TAKES THE MATTER UNDER ADVISEMENT |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL RECORDS 3 CERT | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO PRODUCE MEDICAL RECORDS | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - DEBBRA J GOTTSCHALK FOR RICKY REYNOLDS |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FORAPPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (Entry with fee only) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
CODICIL TO LAST WILL AD TESTAMENT OF ROBERTA MARIE REYNOLDS MARIE REYNOLDS FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: HEARING SET 10/3/2022 AT 2:00PM FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: HEARING SET 10/3/2022 AT 2:00PM |
|
September 19, 2022 | hearing | ORDER SETTING HEARING OF PETITION TO ADMIT WILL AND | |
September 19, 2022 | hearing | NOTICE OF HEARING OF PETITION TO ADMIT WILL AND | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ROBERTA MARIE REYNOLDS | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SECOND CODICIL TO LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ROBERTA |