Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Grady County, OK, . Grady County, OK Superior Courts with Unassigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrady County, OK |
|
COURT MINUTE - PRELIMINARY HEARING 1-16-2024 3:30 PM
Date: October 11, 2023MOTION FOR BOND CONSIDERATION
Date: August 31, 2023SUBPOENA RETURNED - GRADY CO SERVED RAIDEN, WALKER,
Date: October 17, 2023ORDER OF RELEASE
Date: August 31, 2023INITIAL APPEARANCE MINUTE - BOND $10,000; ANNOUNCE
Date: August 31, 2023APPEARANCE BOND - VOIGHT
Date: August 31, 2023MOTION FOR DISCOVERY, INSPECTION, AND PRODUCTION OF
Date: August 31, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - SCHUMACHER LAW GROUP
Date: August 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED - GRADY CO SERVED RAIDEN, WALKER, | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA ISSUED - GRADY CO (ST) (Entry with fee only) WILLIAMS |
|
October 11, 2023 | Hearing | COURT MINUTE - PRELIMINARY HEARING 1-16-2024 3:30 PM | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | WARRANT RETURNED | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | BOOK IN SHEET FOR JAIL COST | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR BOND CONSIDERATION | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF RELEASE BONDING COMPANY: BARRY TUCKER BOND AMOUNT: $10,000 POWER NUMBER: 13214 (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE MINUTE - BOND $10,000; ANNOUNCE ATTORNEY 9-7-2023 2PM, PRELIMINARY HEARING CON 10-11-2023 9AM |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE BOND - VOIGHT | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY, INSPECTION, AND PRODUCTION OF EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.