Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CF-2023-00194
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, OK. Judge CANAVAN, JOHN G., JR presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 03, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2023
Filing Location
Lincoln County, OK
Case Documents
COURT MINUTE: FILED
Date: Sep 07, 2023FILE INFORMATION - COUNT 1
Date: Aug 03, 2023PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT: FILED
Date: Aug 03, 2023FILE INFORMATION - COUNT 1
Date: Aug 03, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | hearing | CM: JUDGE MUELLER/TB STATE PRESENT BY RACHEL THOMPSON AND KELLY TRIMBLE, ASST. D.A; DEFENDANT PRESENT AND BY ATTORNEY IRVEN BOX; CAUSE COMES ON FOR FURTHER INITIAL APPEARANCE; MATTER SET FOR PRE-PRELIMINARY HEARING JANUARY 18, 2024 AT 1:30PM; NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES: | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF DISCOVERY: FILED | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INVOCATION OF COUNSTITIUTIONAL RIGHTS | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTE: FILED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ###PROMISE TO APPEAR: FILED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
###STATEMENT OF INCARCERATION: FILED-93.25 10% TO DA 10% OF INCARCERATION 15% OF INCARCERATION TO DCRF |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | WARRANT AND RETURN: FILED | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE INFORMATION - COUNT 1 | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
###BENCH WARRANT ISSUED - $5000 OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT: FILED | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
FILE FELONY INFORMATION (MISDEMEANOR COUNTS) - COUNT 2 COST VCA CLEET SHERIFFS ARREST FEE AFIS STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CLT1 10% OF FO10 10% OF VCA1 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND 10% OF MEL TRAUMA CARE ASSISTANCE REVOLVING FUND 10% OF TRAUMA CARE OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND DA REVOLVING FUND 10% OF DARF LAW LIBRARY COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE 10% OF CHS ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL CCRF FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
FILE INFORMATION - COUNT 1 COSTS VCA CLEET LAW LIBRARY SHERIFFS ARREST FEE AFIS STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CLT1 10% OF FO10 10% OF VCA1 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND 10% OF MEL SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY 10% OF CHS OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND DA REVOLVING FUND 10% OF DA REVOLVING FUND ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL CCRF FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) COST VCA CLEET SHERIFFS ARREST FEE AFIS STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CLT1 10% OF FO10 10% OF VCA1 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND 10% OF MEL TRAUMA CARE ASSISTANCE REVOLVING FUND 10% OF TRAUMA CARE OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND DA REVOLVING FUND 10% OF DARF LAW LIBRARY COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE 10% OF CHS ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL CCRF FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE FELONY INFORMATION (MISDEMEANOR COUNTS) - COUNT 2 |