Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF OKLAHOMA VS. JOHNSON, NATHAN DAVID
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Ottawa County, OK. Judge MCAFFREY WHALEN BAIRD presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 04, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2023
Filing Location
Ottawa County, OK
Filing Court House
ottawa County
Judge
Hon. MCAFFREY WHALEN BAIRD
Case Documents
DEFTS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION BRIEF IN
Date: Aug 25, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: Aug 25, 2023CM BRB DEFT PRESENT WITH K.GALLON, STATE PRESENT BY
Date: Aug 21, 2023CM BRB DEFT PRESENT, DEFT ADVISED HE WILL NEED TO
Date: Aug 16, 2023CM BRB DEFT PRESENT, DEFT ADVISED HE WILL NEED TO
Date: Aug 16, 2023FILE, ENTER, RECORD INFORMATION - FELONY BASE COST
Date: Aug 07, 2023FILE, ENTER, RECORD INFORMATION - FELONY BASE COST
Date: Aug 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Aug 04, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CM BRB DEFT PRESENT IN PERSON AND WITH ATTY J. BENNETT. STATE PRESENT BY C. WARD. CASE SET FOR FINAL ANN 1-3-24 @9:30AM | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CM BRB DEFT PRESENT AND WITH COUNSEL FROM BENNETT & GALLON OFFICE, COPY OF INFORMATION, CHARGED BY TRUE AND CORRECT NAME, WAIVES READING, ENTERS A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY. IF STATE PRESENT BY S. TADAJEWSKI. ALL CASE CONT'D TO 12-1-23 @9:30AM FOR ANN | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CM BRB DEFT PRESENT IN PERSON, ATTY J. BENNETT PRESENT. DEFT ATTY REQUEST ADDITIONAL TIME. CASE SET FOR FURTHER ANN 10-30-23 @9:30AM | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFT'S MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFT'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION & BRIEF IN SUPPORT |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CM BRB DEFT PRESENT WITH K.GALLON, STATE PRESENT BY | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM BRB DEFT PRESENT, DEFT ADVISED HE WILL NEED TO RETAIN COUNSEL IN THIS CASE. CASE CONT TO 8-21-23 @ 9:30 AM WITH ATTY AND TO TRACK WITH OTHER CASES. S.TADAJEWSKI, CASE CONT'D TO 9-22-23 @9:30AM |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM BRB DEFT PRESENT, DEFT ADVISED HE WILL NEED TO RETAIN COUNSEL IN THIS CASE. CASE CONT TO 8-21-23 @ 9:30 AM WITH ATTY AND TO TRACK WITH OTHER CASES. |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT RETURNED SERVED | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL BOND FEE - DEFT TO APPEAR ON 8-16-23 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF JAIL TIME 1 DAY + BOOKING FEE | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE, ENTER, RECORD INFORMATION - FELONY BASE COST | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
FILE, ENTER, RECORD INFORMATION - FELONY BASE COST LAW LIBRARY FEE (Entry with fee only) CLEET AFIS STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CL10 10% OF FO10 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND 20 OS 1313.7 10% OF MLRF DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S COUNSEL REVOLVING FUND 28 OS 153 10% OF DAC OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE-EFFECTIVE 7-1-04 SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 10% OF SSF TO RV 11-1-06 ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL RV FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT ISSUED 20,000 OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT 28 O.S. 153 (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) 15% OF FEES FOR DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT ISSUED OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT 28 O.S. 153 |