Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CF-2022-00059
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Sequoyah County, OK. Judge PAYTON, JEFF presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 15, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 20, 2023
Filing Location
Sequoyah County, OK
Judge
Hon. PAYTON, JEFF
Case Documents
DISTRICT COURT ARRIAGNMENT AND ORDER RE: MOTIONS AND
Date: Jul 24, 2023MINUTE ORDER
Date: Jun 30, 2023COURT ORDER
Date: May 26, 2023MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: Feb 27, 2023ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: Feb 27, 2023ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL
Date: Feb 23, 2023MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: Feb 13, 2023ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: Feb 13, 2023DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT AND ORDER RE: MOTIONS AND
Date: Dec 21, 2022WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING
Date: Nov 14, 2022SHERIFFS RETURN SERVED
Date: Oct 25, 2022SUBPOENA ISSUED BACK TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY
Date: Oct 24, 2022COURT ORDER
Date: Aug 24, 2022COURT ORDER
Date: Jun 22, 2022MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Date: Apr 06, 2022COURT ORDER
Date: Apr 06, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: Apr 06, 2022COURT ORDER
Date: Mar 02, 2022JAIL FEE X 2
Date: Feb 15, 2022JAIL FEE X 2
Date: Feb 15, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISTRICT COURT ARRIAGNMENT AND ORDER RE: MOTIONS AND DISCOVERY |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | WARRANT RECALL EMAILED TO DISPATCH | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-WARRANT RECALLED | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
FAILURE TO APPEAR BENCH WARRANT (Entry with fee only) |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CM: JP DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR. ISSUE BWBF NO BOND | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MINUTE/SENTENCING ORDER | |
April 13, 2023 | hearing |
CM: JP SET HEARING 5-25-23 @ 1:30PM. JOHN WHITWORTH TO ENTER AS ATTORNEY. |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
February 27, 2023 | hearing | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing |
CM: JP HEARING CONT TO 4-13-23 @ 1:30PM. ERIC JONES ALLOWED TO WITHDRAW. DEFENDANT TO GET NEW ATTORNEY. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
February 13, 2023 | hearing | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MATTER RESET DUE TO JUDGE PAYTON BEING UNAVAILABLE. | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT AND ORDER RE: MOTIONS AND DISCOVERY |
|
November 14, 2022 | hearing | WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM: MO DEFENDANT WITH MR.JONES, WAIVER OF PH AND 30 DAYS. DCA SET BEFORE JUDGE PAYTON ON 12-19-22 AT 1:30PM. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED BACK TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISCOVERY | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WITHOUT WARRANT | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
FELONEY INFORMATION (NON-VIOLENT) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CL10 10% OF FO10 OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 MEDICAL EXP. LIABILITY REV. FUND FEE 10% OF MLRF DA REV. FUND FEE 10% DA. REV. FUND SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL RV FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
FELONEY INFORMATION (NON-VIOLENT) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CL10 10% OF FO10 OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 MEDICAL EXP. LIABILITY REV. FUND FEE 10% OF MLRF DA REV. FUND FEE 10% DA. REV. FUND SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL RV FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | FELONEY INFORMATION (NON-VIOLENT) | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | INFORMATION BOND FEE | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
JAIL FEE X 2 2/11-2/12 (Entry with fee only) ENTER BONDSMAN'S NAME: HOWARD COPELAND ENTER POWER NUMBER: SS-30-26545 ENTER BOND AMOUNT: 20,000.00 ENTER BONDING COMPANY:ZZOOM BAIL BONDS |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
JAIL FEE X 2 2/11-2/12 (Entry with fee only) ENTER BONDSMAN'S NAME: HOWARD COPELAND ENTER POWER NUMBER: SS-30-26545 ENTER BOND AMOUNT: 20,000.00 ENTER BONDING COMPANY:ZZOOM BAIL BONDS |