Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tulsa County, OK, . Tulsa County, OK Superior Courts with Tammy Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTulsa County, OK |
|
PETITION
Date: March 13, 2023APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: March 13, 2023PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON BLOOM LABS LLC / ON 4-4-23
Date: April 10, 2023PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON COLTON CASE SAUNDERS GARRETT / ON 4-4-23
Date: April 10, 2023MOTION TO RECONSIDER / C - J
Date: May 22, 2023MINUTE ORDER
Date: May 15, 2023AGREED MOTION TO RECONSIDER / A - J
Date: July 27, 2023ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: March 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED MOTION TO RECONSIDER / A - J | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RECONSIDER / C - J | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | PALMER,WILMA: AGREED ORDER FOR POSESSION IS VACATED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION. NOTICE SENT TO THOSE LISTED ON THE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING. | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER SUBMITTED TO JUDGE TAMMY BRUCE DENIED CASE WAS DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PRESENT ON 4-11-2023 | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PALMER,WILMA: AGREED ORDER FOR POSSESSION IS SUBMITTED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT. | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | BRUCE TAMMY: PLAINTIFF APPEARED.NOT DEFENDANT APPEARED NOT FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PRESENT | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON BLOOM LABS LLC / ON 4-4-23 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON COLTON CASE SAUNDERS GARRETT / ON 4-4-23 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.