Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tulsa County, OK, . Tulsa County, OK Superior Courts with Mary Ann Godsby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTulsa County, OK |
|
PETITION TO DETERMINE CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT
Date: June 22, 2023COURT MINUTE
Date: July 27, 2023PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM
Date: August 04, 2023APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: June 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE ON JUNE 28, 2023/DF/BY PSS
Date: July 05, 2023UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 27, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 22, 2023ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND NOTICE OF TRANSFER
Date: July 12, 2023INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: August 10, 2023TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM
Date: July 28, 2023TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM
Date: July 24, 2023NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DHS
Date: July 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTE | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | GODSBY, MARY ANN (FD DOCKET E): PO-2023-2108 FP-2023-219 CEPO - SETTING IS PASSED BY THE COURT TO 8-10-2023 AT 9:00 AM. CONTINUED EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTED ON BEHALF OF SELF ONY AND RESET BEFORE JUDGE MARY ANN GODSBY ON 8-10-2023 AT 9:00 AM IN PERSON IN ROOM 348. CONTINUED EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION ENTERED AND SIGNED. (IN PERSON, 15 MINUTES, ROOM 348) PETITIONER REPRESENTED BY KATHY SHERWOOD. RESPONDENT REPRESENTED BY GREG MEIER. | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DHS | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE DEBORRAH LUDI LEITCH: (PARENTING PLAN CONFERENCE): PETITIONER PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY KATHY SHERWOOD, PRESENT. RESPONDENT PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY GREG MEIER, PRESENT. BOTH PARTIES WERE GIVEN THE INSTRUCTIONS FOR THE ONLINE PARENTING PLAN CONFERENCE @ TULSACOUNTYDISTRICTCOURT.ORG. PARTIES ALSO ORDERED TO SIGN UP FOR THE PARENTING PROGRAM THAT'S WITHIN COMPLIANCE OF OUR LOCAL COURT RULE. COURT MINUTE, ENTERED. | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S PETITION TO DETERMINE CUSTODY, VISITATION AND CHILD SUPPORT AND RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER-ORIGINAL FILED IN FD-2023-219 IN ERROR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.