Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tulsa County, OK, . Tulsa County, OK Superior Courts with Julie C. Doss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationTulsa County, OK |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - COSTS WAIVED | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE JULIE C DOSS: PLAINTIFF APPEARS ON MICROSOFT TEAMS, PRO SE. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF, EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER DISMISSED. ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED AND ENTERED. COSTS WAIVED, | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER WAS SERVED/DF/03-25-2022/TCSO | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE PROTECTIVE ORDER TO THIS CASE. | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE JULIE C DOSS: UPON SWORN AFFIDAVIT, THE EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTED FOR SELF SET FOR 4/7/2022 AT 9:00AM , JUDGE DOSS, ON VIDEO. THE DEFENDANT IS TO REMAIN 100 YARDS FROM THE PLAINTIFF AND THE PLAINTIFF'S HOME AT ALL TIMES. DEFENDANT IS TO SURRENDER ALL FIREARMS TO LAW ENFORCEMENT. | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUED | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.