Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SC-2023-1111
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Tulsa County, OK. Judge Tammy Bruce presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2023
Last Refreshed
July 13, 2023
Filing Location
Tulsa County, OK
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | BRUCE, TAMMY: PLAINTIFF APPEARED. DEFENDANT APPEARED REFERRED TO MEDIATION BUT COULD NOT SETTLE NON JURY TRIAL HELD CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, JUDGE SIGNED ORDER | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SERVED WINCO & SECURITY TEAM BY SERVING GARRETT COFFIELD (MANAGER) 2/6/23 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE TO THIS CASE. | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | LAW LIBRARY FEE | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - SHERIFF | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PAUPER'S AFFIDAVIT - JUDGE TAMMY BRUCE // FEES RESERVED TO BE ASSESSED BEFORE FINAL ORDER IS ENTERED | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | AMOUNT IN DEBT OF $400.00 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | INDEBTEDNESS <$5000.00. | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. |