Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Washington County, OK, . Washington County, OK Superior Courts with Russell Vaclaw presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, OK |
|
MOTION TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY (SB)
Date: June 28, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (LUIS ORTIZ) (SB)
Date: June 28, 2023APPEARANCE BOND - AMY SMALLWOOD (SB)
Date: June 23, 2023ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR CRIMINAL DEFENDANT(COPY
Date: June 21, 2023COURT MINUTE FILED (KM)
Date: June 19, 2023FILE ENTER & RECORD INFORMATION (CT I) (SB)
Date: June 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CM:VACLAW-THREADGILL BY DRAKE-DEFT W/ATTY L ORTIZ- | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CM:VACLAW-THREADGILL-DEFT BY ATTY L ORTIZ. MATTER COMES | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM:VACLAW-THREADGILL-DEFT AND ATTY APPEAR NOT. MATTER COMES ON FOR STATUS. MATTER IS CONTINUED BY AGREEMENT TO 8/23/23 @ 1:30PM; MR ORTIZ IS TO NOTIFY THE DEFT OF THIS NEW COURT DATE. (KM) ON FOR STATUS. MR ORTIZ ADVISES THE DEFT IS CURRENTLY IN A HOSPITALIZATION/TREATMENT PROGRAM. CRT TAKES BENCH WARRANT UNDER ADVISEMENT UNTIL 10/4/23 @ 9:00AM. (KM) INTERPRETOR A DIXON. MATTER COMES ON FOR STATUS. MATTER IS PASSED AND DEFT IS ORDERED BACK 1/17/24 @ 1:30PM. (KM) |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM:VACLAW-THREADGILL-DEFT AND ATTY APPEAR NOT. MATTER COMES ON FOR STATUS. MATTER IS CONTINUED BY AGREEMENT TO 8/23/23 @ 1:30PM; MR ORTIZ IS TO NOTIFY THE DEFT OF THIS NEW COURT DATE. (KM) ON FOR STATUS. MR ORTIZ ADVISES THE DEFT IS CURRENTLY IN A HOSPITALIZATION/TREATMENT PROGRAM. CRT TAKES BENCH WARRANT UNDER ADVISEMENT UNTIL 10/4/23 @ 9:00AM. (KM) |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM:VACLAW-THREADGILL-DEFT AND ATTY APPEAR NOT. MATTER COMES ON FOR STATUS. MATTER IS CONTINUED BY AGREEMENT TO 8/23/23 @ 1:30PM; MR ORTIZ IS TO NOTIFY THE DEFT OF THIS NEW COURT DATE. (KM) |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY (SB) | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (LUIS ORTIZ) (SB) | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPEARANCE BOND - AMY SMALLWOOD (SB) POWER NUMBER: ABB-2372594 BOND AMOUNT: $5000.00 (Entry with fee only) |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CM: MARK KANE APPOINTED HIMSELF AS OIDS ATTY (SB) | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR CRIMINAL DEFENDANT(COPY PUT IN MARK KANES BOX)(JAD) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.