Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOHN SPIRES, et al. vs. RONALD NOEL, et al.
On September 16, 2016 a cv case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Navajo County, AZ. Judge MICHALA RUECHEL presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 16, 2016
Last Refreshed
March 26, 2022
Filing Location
Navajo County, AZ
Filing Court House
Navajo County Superior
Category
CV
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER: Denying |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION: Enforce Judgment / Settlement |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: Memorandum |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: Miscellaneous |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION: AMEND |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Hearing |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE: RESPONSE |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION: Motion |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER: ANSWER |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER: Denying |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT: AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE: TO MOTION |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION: Dismiss |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Appearance |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: Miscellaneous |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | SERVICE: Return of Service |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | SERVICE: Return of Service |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT: Complaint |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: Information Sheet |
|