Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rbs Citizens Na, filed a(n) Cv case against Jaime C Garcia, Yadira M Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Yavapai County, AZ, . Yavapai County, AZ Superior Courts Yavapai County Superior with KENTON JONES presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2011 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYavapai County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYavapai County Superior |
JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 30, 2013SERVICE: Return of Service
Date: February 15, 2011MOTION: VACATE
Date: December 29, 2011ORDER: WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: September 27, 2011SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2011-01-26T00:00:00JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 16, 2013ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: 2011-01-26T00:00:00STIPULATION: STIPULATION
Date: August 08, 2011COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2011-01-26T00:00:00MOTION: Enforce Judgment / Settlement
Date: November 03, 2011MOTION: WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: August 25, 2011ORDER: VACATING
Date: January 12, 2012JUDGMENT: Judgment
Date: August 16, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.