Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Real Estate Joint Venture Concerning 8516 NW Wygant Street, Portland, Oregon vs Mark Murphy, Jami Murphy, Matthew Abbott, All Other Occupants
On September 12, 2023 a property - general case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Multnomah County, OR. Judge Adrian L. Brown presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 12, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2024
Filing Location
Multnomah County, OR
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Matarazzo, Judith;OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2024 |
Hearing - Summary Judgment Plaintiff by Kenneth Dobson Judge: Huegli, James D |
||
February 17, 2024 | Exhibit - List | ||
February 15, 2024 |
Hearing - Prima Facie Continuation from 2/9 Judge: Brown, Adrian L |
||
February 12, 2024 |
Hearing - Prima Facie Continuation from 2/9 Judge: Brown, Adrian L |
||
February 09, 2024 |
Hearing - Prima Facie
Judge: Brown, Adrian L |
||
February 08, 2024 |
Call Prima Facie Plaintiff ready 30 minutes Available late AM, or PM Judge: Matarazzo, Judith H |
||
February 08, 2024 |
Call Prima Facie Judge: Matarazzo, Judith H |
||
January 17, 2024 |
Judgment - Proposed **Unsigned** |
||
December 28, 2023 | Motion - Judgment | ||
December 28, 2023 |
Judgment - Proposed **Unsigned** |
||
December 21, 2023 |
Order - Default
Judge: Matarazzo, Judith H |
||
December 19, 2023 |
Declaration of Kenneth Dobson |
||
December 19, 2023 | Motion - Default Order | ||
December 15, 2023 |
Declaration of Kenneth Dobson |
||
December 15, 2023 | Motion - Summary Judgment | ||
December 15, 2023 |
Declaration of Brad Neef |
||
December 01, 2023 | Answer | ||
December 01, 2023 |
Order - Fee Waiver
Judge: Authority, Administrative |
||
December 01, 2023 | Application - Fee Deferral Waiver | ||
November 17, 2023 | Summons | ||
November 17, 2023 | Proof of Service - Substitute | ||
November 17, 2023 | Proof - Service | ||
November 03, 2023 | Service | ||
November 03, 2023 |
Complaint - Amended 1st - **Added Defs** |
||
October 31, 2023 |
Motion For Alternative Service |
||
October 31, 2023 |
Order - Allowing Service By Posting Alernative Service Judge: Matarazzo, Judith H |
||
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Ejectment |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Service |