Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Stacey Lynette Commodore Mcginnis VS Dustin Speer , defendant, et al
On April 11, 2024 a motor veh accid 320 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Charleston County, SC. Judge Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 12, 2024
Filing Location
Charleston County, SC
Judge
Hon. Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court
Category
Common Pleas
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves a legal case in the Court of Common Pleas in Charleston, South Carolina. The plaintiff, Stacey Lynette Commodore-McGinnis, is suing the defendant, Dustin Speer, for a collision that occurred on November 19, 2023. The plain…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ADR/Alternative Dispute Resolution (Workflow)
Date: Nov 07, 2024Summons Complaint
Date: Apr 11, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ADR/Alternative Dispute Resolution (Workflow) | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons & Complaint |