Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Alonzo Lewis VS Michael Davis
On January 05, 2023 a motor veh accid 320 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, SC. Judge Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 05, 2023
Filing Location
Fairfield County, SC
Judge
Hon. Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court
Category
Common Pleas
Case Outcome Type
Ended by Non Jury
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NEF(05-12-2023 02:31:41 PM) Notice/Notice of Appearance
Date: May 12, 2023Judgment/Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: May 12, 2023Master/Order for Damages
Date: Apr 18, 2023NEF(04-18-2023 01:20:54 PM) Master/Order/Other
Date: Apr 18, 2023NEF(03-09-2023 12:24:18 PM) Order/Referred to Master or ...
Date: Mar 09, 2023Motion/Refer to Master or Special Referee
Date: Mar 09, 2023Order/Entry of Default
Date: Feb 22, 2023NEF(02-22-2023 12:02:48 PM) Order/Entry of Default
Date: Feb 22, 2023NEF(02-21-2023 04:18:25 PM) Order/Order Cover Sheet 25....
Date: Feb 21, 2023Affidavit/Default
Date: Feb 20, 2023NEF(02-20-2023 02:26:30 PM) Affidavit/Default
Date: Feb 20, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ADR/Alternative Dispute Resolution (Workflow) | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(05-12-2023 02:31:41 PM) Notice/Notice of Appearance | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment/Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice/Notice of Appearance | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Master/Order for Damages | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(04-18-2023 01:20:54 PM) Master/Order/Other | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment/Judgment | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(03-09-2023 12:24:18 PM) Order/Referred to Master or ... | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion/Refer to Master or Special Referee | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order/Order Cover Sheet $25.00 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(03-09-2023 08:49:02 AM) Motion/Refer to Master or Sp... | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order/Referred to Master or Special Referee | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order/Entry of Default | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(02-22-2023 12:02:48 PM) Order/Entry of Default | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion/Damages (per default order) | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(02-21-2023 04:18:25 PM) Order/Order Cover Sheet $25.... | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order/Order Cover Sheet $25.00 | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Default | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(02-20-2023 02:26:30 PM) Affidavit/Default | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(01-29-2023 10:07:38 AM) Service/Affidavit Of Service |