Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Crawford Funeral Home VS Delia D. Twitty
On October 04, 2023 a debt collection 110 case was filed by Crawford Funeral Home, represented by Blackwell, David Reese Ii, against Twitty, Delia D., in the jurisdiction of Lancaster County, SC. Judge Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 04, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 09, 2023
Filing Location
Lancaster County, SC
Judge
Hon. Clerk Of Court C P, G S, And Family Court
Category
Common Pleas
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NEF(10-05-2023 01:34:18 PM) Certificate/Certificate
Date: Oct 05, 2023Certificate/Certificate of Mailing
Date: Oct 05, 2023Summons Complaint
Date: Oct 04, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ADR/Alternative Dispute Resolution (Workflow) | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NEF(10-05-2023 01:34:18 PM) Certificate/Certificate | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate/Certificate of Mailing | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons & Complaint |