Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JAMES PERRY VS ELIZABETH PAYNE Jury Trial
On February 16, 2023 an aa - auto accident case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shelby County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 16, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 20, 2024
Filing Location
Shelby County, TN
Category
AA - AUTO ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: WOOTEN, CEDRICK D |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS NOTICE....T | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ANS TO INTERROG MISC | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROG/REQ FOR PROD | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE AT ISSUE | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE GENERATED AND MAILED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL SESSIONS APPEAL | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | GEN SESSIONS COSTS ADDED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CATEGORY 2 FILING G.S. APPEAL | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CLK COMM FOR GEN SESS FEES |