Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
EVELYN ROYSTON VS. JOSEPH BROWN Non-jury Trial
On February 20, 2024 a tt - tort case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shelby County. Judge Gina C. Higgins presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 20, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 06, 2024
Filing Location
Shelby County, TN
Judge
Category
TT - TORT
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: HIGGINS, GINA C |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED EVENT STRUCK BY ATTY | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION MISC - T | |
March 22, 2024 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: HIGGINS, GINA C |
|
March 15, 2024 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: HIGGINS, GINA C |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | TRANSFER TO ANOTHER DIVISION | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | MISC DOCKET ENTRY....T | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED TO MISC | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE GENERATED AND MAILED | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CLK COMM FOR GEN SESS FEES | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | GENERAL SESSIONS APPEAL | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | GEN SESSIONS COSTS ADDED | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE AT ISSUE | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CATEGORY 2 FILING G.S. APPEAL |