Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LEANEDRA SANDERS VS BRADRICK SANDERS Non-jury Trial
On March 01, 2023 a dc - divorce with children case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shelby County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 01, 2023
Last Refreshed
April 16, 2024
Filing Location
Shelby County, TN
Category
DC - DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER PENDING | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | RESP TO REQ FOR PROD OF DOC | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ANS TO INTERROG MISC | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ORD SCHED. STATUS CONF. | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER PENDING | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORD MISC - T | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER PENDING | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | REQ FOR PROD OF DOCUMENTS | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REQ FOR PROD OF DOCUMENTS | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CONT TO A DATE - T | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE GENERATED AND MAILED | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSD TO MISC | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CATEGORY 5 FILING | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | DIVORCE REFEREE | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |