Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
EARLIE SPEARMAN VS KATEASA HITE Jury Trial
On March 02, 2023 an aa - auto accident case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shelby County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 02, 2023
Last Refreshed
June 24, 2023
Filing Location
Shelby County, TN
Category
AA - AUTO ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: KIGHT, YOLANDA R |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROG/REQ FOR PROD | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSD TO MISC | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | E-FILED -----------COMPLAINT | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CATEGORY 1 FILING |