Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ERICA HIGGINBOTHAM VS MICHAEL HIGGINBOTHAM Non-jury Trial
On July 11, 2023 a dc - divorce with children case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shelby County. Judge Yolanda R. Kight presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 11, 2023
Last Refreshed
May 18, 2024
Filing Location
Shelby County, TN
Judge
Category
DC - DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2024 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: KIGHT, YOLANDA R |
|
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED | |
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION | |
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORD MISC - T | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORD MISC - T | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF RECORD | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSD TO MISC | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSD TO MISC | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
January 19, 2024 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: KIGHT BROWN, YOLANDA R |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSD TO MISC | |
January 08, 2024 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: KIGHT BROWN, YOLANDA R |
|
December 01, 2023 | hearing |
MOTION
Judge: KIGHT, YOLANDA R |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED EVENT STRUCK BY ATTY | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO MOTION | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO MOTION | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM FILED | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED EVENT STRUCK BY ATTY | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS NOTICE....T | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO INTERR/REQ FOR PROD | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CONT TO A DATE - T | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO REQ FOR PROD OF DOC | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM FILED | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO INTERR/REQ FOR PROD | |
September 07, 2023 | hearing |
HEARING
Judge: KIGHT BROWN, YOLANDA R |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ANS TO INTERROG MISC | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO REQ FOR PROD OF DOC | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED EVENT STRUCK BY ATTY | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERED | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORD MISC - T | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER PENDING | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO MOTION | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | RESP TO MOTION | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS NOTICE....T | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED EVENT STRUCK BY ATTY | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORD MISC - T | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERED | |
August 03, 2023 | hearing |
HEARING
Judge: KIGHT BROWN, YOLANDA R |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORD MISC - T | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED EVENT STRUCK BY ATTY | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROG/REQ FOR PROD | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROG/REQ FOR PROD | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORD MISC - T | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSD TO MISC | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION MISC - T | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERED | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MANDATORY INJUNCTION | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORD OF PROTECTION | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSD TO MISC | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PET FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CATEGORY 5 FILING | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DIVORCE REFEREE |