Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE VS LAQUISHA HART Non-jury Trial
On December 16, 2022 an aa - auto accident case was filed in the jurisdiction of Shelby County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 16, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 23, 2024
Filing Location
Shelby County, TN
Category
AA - AUTO ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | hearing |
DISMISSAL CALENDAR
Judge: KIGHT BROWN, YOLANDA R |
|
January 22, 2024 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: KIGHT BROWN, YOLANDA R |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORD OF CONT. TO DATE | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CONT TO A DATE - T | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE GENERATED AND MAILED | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE-PPS/OTHER | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSD TO MISC | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CATEGORY 1 FILING |