Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Marriage of YAZMIN CABEZA and SAMMY CABEZA
A Divorce: Children case was filed by Cabeza, Yazmin, against Cabeza, Sammy, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX. Judge Paul L. LePak presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 22, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 21, 2024
Filing Location
Bell County, TX
Filing Court House
264th Judicial District Court
Category
Divorce: Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Relief Denied
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2024 |
Temporary Hearing TEMPORARY ORDERS REQUESTED BY BOTH SIDES; MOTION FOR DRUG SCREENING FILED BY RIDLEY |
||
May 20, 2024 | RETURNED COORDINATOR MAIL | ||
May 09, 2024 |
No Fee Documents (e-File) PROPOSED DISPOSITION OF ISSUES FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS |
||
May 03, 2024 |
Order for Drug Screening UNSIGNED ORDER ON MOTION FOR DRUG SCREENING |
||
May 03, 2024 | MOTION FOR DRUG SCREENING BY RIDLEY - JH SIGNED/SET | ||
May 03, 2024 | COVER LETTER BY RIDLEY | ||
April 26, 2024 |
Amended Petition FIRST AMENDED COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE AND REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS BY GARCIA - JH SAW |
||
April 17, 2024 |
CountClaim/CrssAct/Interpl/Interv/3rdPartyContest (efile) COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE AND REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS BY GARCIA - JH SAW |
||
April 02, 2024 |
Served Service SERVED FPO ON SAMMY - SIGNATURE ILLEGIBLE, SIGNED ON 3/29/24 |
||
March 27, 2024 |
Docket Entry 03/26/2024 AJ Protective Order Hearing Electronic record through Lifesize Petitioner appeared with atty of record, P. Ridley Respondent appeared, Pro Se Petitioner announced ready on PO and will reset any TRO hearing. Respondent requested more time on PO. Denied due to an extension already being granted. P. Ridley called Petitioner and Respondent, both sworn and testified Petitioner's 1 = pic of cocaine = admitted over obj Petitioner's 2 = pic of gun = admitted over obj Ruling: Grant Protective Order for Yazmin Cabeza for one year - effective until 3/26/2025; denied Protective Order on the child |
||
March 27, 2024 |
Notice of Appearance of Counsel ATTORNEY APPEARANCE BY GARCIA |
||
March 27, 2024 |
Receipt of Exhibits hearing date 03/26/2024 |
||
March 27, 2024 |
Copy Request (copies) REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPY- placed in box 52 |
||
March 26, 2024 | CLERK'S COPY OF FPO ON SAMMY - CERTIFIED MAIL | ||
March 26, 2024 |
Family Protective Order TRO |
||
March 26, 2024 |
Service FAX TO BELL CO SHERIFF OF FPO |
||
March 26, 2024 |
Service EMAIL TO KILLEEN POLICE & TEXAS DOS OF FPO |
||
March 25, 2024 | COVER LETTER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | ||
March 25, 2024 |
Order [REDACTED] ORDER TO SHERIFF OR BELL COUNTY, TEXAS SIGNED BY JUDGE DARBY 03.26.24 |
||
March 25, 2024 |
Protective Orders Signed (OCA) [REDACTED] FINAL PROTECTIVE ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE DARBY 03.26.24 |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Served Service SERVED EX PARTE TO SAMMY 03/20/24 |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Served Service SERVED SHOW CASUE TO SAMMY 03/20/24 |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Served Service SERVED CITATION (AMENDED PETITION) ON SAMMY 03/20/24 |
||
March 15, 2024 | Protective Order | ||
March 15, 2024 | Show Cause | ||
March 15, 2024 | CLERK'S COPY OF PROTE & S/C ON SAMMY - BOX 52 | ||
March 15, 2024 |
Family Protective Order TRO / MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY RIDLEY |
||
March 14, 2024 |
Order for Continuance ORDER GRANTING CONTINUNACE SIGNED BY JUDGE DUSKIE ON 3/14/24 |
||
March 14, 2024 |
Extended Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER SETTING HEARING SIGNED BY JUDGE DUSKIE ON 3/14/24 |
||
March 14, 2024 | COVER LETTER BY RIDLEY | ||
March 14, 2024 | REQUEST FOR SERVICE TO SAMMY | ||
March 14, 2024 |
Service FAX TO BELL CO SHERIFF OF EXTENDED EX PARTE |
||
March 14, 2024 |
Motion - No Fee (e-File) MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER BY RIDLEY JH SAW |
||
March 14, 2024 |
Service EMAIL TO KILLEEN POLICE OF EXTENDED EX PARTE |
||
March 14, 2024 | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE BY RIDLEY JH SAW | ||
March 13, 2024 |
Order to Substitute Counsel ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL SIGNED BY JUDGE LEPAK 3/15/24 |
||
March 13, 2024 | COVER LETTER BY RIDLEY | ||
March 05, 2024 |
Motion to Substitute Counsel MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY RIDLEY - JH SAW |
||
March 05, 2024 | COVER LETTER BY RIDLEY | ||
March 05, 2024 |
Notice of Appearance of Counsel ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RIDLEY - JH SAW |
||
March 04, 2024 | Show Cause | ||
March 04, 2024 | CLERK'S COPY OF PROTE & S/C ON SAMMY - BOX 134 | ||
March 04, 2024 | Citation | ||
March 04, 2024 | Temporary Restraining Order | ||
March 04, 2024 | CLERK'S COPY OF CIT, TRO & S/C ON SAMMY - BOX 134 | ||
March 04, 2024 | Protective Order | ||
March 01, 2024 |
Service FAX TO BELL CO SHERIFF OF EX PARTE |
||
March 01, 2024 |
Service EMAIL TO KILLEEN POLICE OF EX PARTE |
||
February 29, 2024 |
Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order (OCA) [REDACTED] TEMPORARY EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE LEPAK ON 3/1/24 |
||
February 29, 2024 | TCIC FORM | ||
February 29, 2024 | REQUEST FOR SERVICE TO SAMMY | ||
February 29, 2024 |
Application for Protective Order (OCA) [REDACTED] AN APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER BY PRITCHARD |
||
February 29, 2024 |
Amended Petition SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE BY PRITCHARD |
||
February 28, 2024 |
Amended Petition FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE BY PRITCHARD |
||
February 28, 2024 |
Request for Service AMENDED REQUEST FOR SERVICE TO SAMMY CABEZA |
||
February 22, 2024 | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF SHOW CAUSE HEARING WITH NOTICE OF HEARING SIGNED BY JUDGE LEPAK ON 3/1/24 | ||
February 22, 2024 |
Request for Service REQUEST FOR SERIVICE TO SAMMY |
||
February 22, 2024 |
Petition (e-File) ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE BY PRITCHARD |
||
February 22, 2024 | New Case Filed (OCA) |