Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ex Parte Jesse Luis Guillen
A Writ Of Habeas Corpus-Bond Reduction case was filed in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX. Judge Scott J. Becker presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Collin County, TX
Category
Writ of Habeas Corpus-Bond Reduction
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Habeas Corpus
Status
Closed
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order to Bookin to Bookin |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Bond Reduction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Becker, Scott J.) | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Considering all factors of Art. 17.15, the Ct. leaves bond at current amount. If D makes bond he must have ELM and remain 500 feet away from V and her residence. SJB Considering all factors of Art. 17.15, the Ct. leaves bond at current amount. If D makes bond he must have ELM and remain 500 feet away from V and her residence. SJB |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry State objected to hearing due to lack of notice. Objection sustained. SJB State objected to hearing due to lack of notice. Objection sustained. SJB |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bond Reduction Hearing Reset CANCELED Bond Reduction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Becker, Scott J.) Reset |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Order Order Setting Hearing |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus - Bond Reduction (OCA) $120.00 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ Case Information Sheet |