Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Patricia Baca Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC: ATTY)
Date: April 11, 2016AGREED MOT/ W/D OF COUNSEL (PATRICIA BENNETT)
Date: May 26, 2015CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET
Date: March 31, 2015REFUND REQUEST FORM-CREATED ON 04/26/2016
Date: April 26, 2016AUSTIN FORM
Date: April 11, 2016DOCKET SHEET
Date: April 11, 2016BLUE CARD
Date: April 11, 2016NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 01/19/2016 Image ID 4215 Signed 11/25/2015
Date: November 25, 2015ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Date: April 11, 2016TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: July 14, 2015ORIGINAL INCOME W/H ORD/NOTICE FOR SUPT (IWO)
Date: July 14, 2015ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (L MICHELLE DELOTTO)
Date: June 09, 2015ORD/AGREED MOT/W/D COUNSEL (PATRICIA B BENNETT)
Date: May 27, 2015ORDER ON AGREED MOT/ W/D COUNSEL (PROPOSED)
Date: May 26, 2015ASSOCIATE JUDGES REPORT OF TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: April 21, 2015Citation Tr# 16 RET EXEC(MELISSA LEAKE MARTINEZ) On 04/14/2015
Date: April 20, 2015T.R.O. Tr# 18 RET EXEC(MELISSA LEAKE MARTINEZ) On 04/14/2015
Date: April 20, 2015RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (MELISSA MARTINEZ)
Date: April 17, 2015ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: April 17, 2015TRO & ORD/SET/HRG/TEMP/ORDERS (4/21/15 @ 8:30AM)
Date: April 09, 2015T.R.O.-ISSUED ON MELISSA LEAKE MARTINEZ. H/R 04/21/2015 - 08:30-On 04/09/2015
Date: April 08, 2015Citation-ISSUED ON MELISSA LEAKE MARTINEZ-On 04/09/2015
Date: April 08, 2015TRO
Date: April 08, 2015REQUEST
Date: April 08, 20152ND AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: April 08, 2015FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: April 01, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: March 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Accounting notification from #49 | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ADJUSTMENT-REFUND #E4708795 CIT NVR ISSD TR#4 | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REFUND REQUEST FORM-CREATED ON 04/26/2016 | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Adjustment for # 4 citation never issued | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC: ATTY) | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | AUSTIN FORM | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.