Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Synchrony Bank v. Sarah Pray
On March 14, 2024 a collection - credit card case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lamoille County. Judge Richardson, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 14, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 08, 2024
Filing Location
Lamoille County, VT
Category
Collection - Credit Card
Case Outcome Type
Judgment - Consent
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Sent to Judge (Judicial Officer: Richardson, Daniel P.) | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Closed | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Order (Judicial Officer: Richardson, Daniel P.) | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice to Parties | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Sent to Case Parties | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation Filed | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice to Parties | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Sent to Case Parties | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Sent to Case Parties | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice to Parties | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Return of Service - Complaint | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Filed | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit Regarding Military Service | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Filing - Civil | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits |