Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Knapp, Haley Elizabeth, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Cleburne County, AR, . Cleburne County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2014 |
CategoryGd - Guardianship-Prob |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCleburne County, AR |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION CONTINUANCE | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.